Victor Tagle v. USDHS
Plaintiff / Appellant: VICTOR MANUEL TAGLE
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DHS/ICC Ins, AKA DHS, AKA INS
Case Number: 19-17290
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Victor Manuel Tagle opening brief (Informal: Yes) 6 pages. Served on 11/20/2019. Major deficiencies: motion pending. [11518987] (KWG) [Entered: 12/03/2019 11:00 AM]
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Victor Manuel Tagle motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11517459] (NAC) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:35 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11502380] (CKP) [Entered: 11/18/2019 01:18 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Victor Manuel Tagle opening brief due 01/14/2020. [11496203] (RT) [Entered: 11/12/2019 02:08 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor Tagle v. USDHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VICTOR MANUEL TAGLE
Represented By: Victor Manuel Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DHS/ICC Ins, AKA DHS, AKA INS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?