Roberto Darden v. Barbara von Blanckensee
Petitioner / Appellant: ROBERTO ANTOINE DARDEN
Respondent / Appellee: BARBARA VON BLANCKENSEE
Case Number: 19-17297
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The opening brief is due February 24, 2020; the answering brief is due March 25, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the court waives the excerpts of record requirement. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. The supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket report, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. (MOATT) [11548784] (AF) [Entered: 01/02/2020 10:42 AM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Roberto Antoine Darden motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11535780] (NAC) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:05 PM]
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Filed order (JEROME FARRIS and M. MARGARET MCKEOWN): The request for a certificate of appealability is denied as unnecessary. See Forde v. U.S. Parole Commn, 114 F.3d 878, 879 (9th Cir. 1997) (order). A review of this courts docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal are due. Within 21 days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall either (1) pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment, or (2) file in this court a Form 4 Motion and Affidavit for Permission to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Failure to pay the fees or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis shall result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The Clerk shall serve a copy of Form 4 on appellant. If appellant pays the fees, the following briefing schedule shall apply: the opening brief is due February 24, 2020; the answering brief is due March 25, 2020; the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. If appellant files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, the briefing schedule will be set upon disposition of the motion. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the court waives the excerpts of record requirement. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. The Clerk shall serve on appellant a copy of the After Opening a Case Pro Se Appellants document. [11504510] (AF) [Entered: 11/19/2019 03:54 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 10/30/2019. Record on appeal included: Yes. [11497084] (JBS) [Entered: 11/13/2019 08:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberto Darden v. Barbara von Blanckensee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ROBERTO ANTOINE DARDEN
Represented By: Roberto Antoine Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: BARBARA VON BLANCKENSEE
Represented By: Denise Ann Faulk Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?