State of California, et al v. USEPA, et al
Defendant: E. SCOTT PRUITT, Administrator, U.S. EPA
Defendant / Appellant: ANDREW WHEELER, Acting Aministrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra and the California Air Resources Board and STATE OF OREGON
Intervenor Plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND
Case Number: 19-17480
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 32 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants unopposed motion [ # 31 ] for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due February 14, 2020. The answering brief is due March 16, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11573242] (LBS) [Entered: 01/24/2020 10:56 AM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) Appellants USEPA and Andrew Wheeler Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/14/2020. Date of service: 01/22/2020. [11569583] [19-17480] (Pepin, Joan) [Entered: 01/22/2020 09:35 AM]
January 16, 2020 Filing 30 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/03/2020, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11564857] (CL) [Entered: 01/16/2020 12:18 PM]
January 10, 2020 Filing 29 Filed order (RICHARD A. PAEZ and N. RANDY SMITH): The emergency motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 12 ]) for a stay pending appeal is granted. In granting the motion, we express no view regarding the merits of the appeal. We sua sponte expedite this appeal. The opening brief is due February 10, 2020. The answering brief is due March 9, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(1). The Clerk shall place this case on the next available calendar upon the completion of briefing. See 9th Cir. G.O. 3.3(f). [11558460] (AF) [Entered: 01/10/2020 03:58 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) Appellants USEPA and Andrew Wheeler reply to response (). Date of service: 01/08/2020. [11555090] [19-17480] (Pepin, Joan) [Entered: 01/08/2020 12:31 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 27 Filed (ECF) Appellees Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont response opposing motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 01/02/2020. [11549610] [19-17480] (Rumsey, Elizabeth) [Entered: 01/02/2020 05:21 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 26 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/27/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11545263]. [19-17480] (AD) [Entered: 12/27/2019 12:44 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 25 Filed (ECF) Appellants USEPA and Andrew Wheeler Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/27/2019. [11544786] [19-17480] (Pepin, Joan) [Entered: 12/27/2019 08:02 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 24 Added Attorney(s) Joshua Morris Segal for party(s) Appellee State of Maryland, in case 19-17480. [11544201] (QDL) [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:40 AM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua Morris Segal (Office of the Attorney General, 200 St. Paul Place, Baltimore, MD 21202) for Appellee State of Maryland. Date of service: 12/26/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11544184] [19-17480] (Segal, Joshua) [Entered: 12/26/2019 11:32 AM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11541971] (LW) [Entered: 12/23/2019 11:52 AM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): Appellees request for an extension of time to respond to appellants motion for a stay pending appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 17 ]) is granted in part. The response is due January 2, 2020. Any reply in support of the motion for a stay pending appeal is due January 8, 2020. [11540762] (JMR) [Entered: 12/20/2019 04:04 PM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Appellants USEPA and Andrew Wheeler response to motion ([ # 17 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 17 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 12/19/2019. [11538095] [19-17480] (Pepin, Joan) [Entered: 12/19/2019 09:04 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 Added Attorney(s) Paul Garrahan for party(s) Appellee State of Oregon, in case 19-17480. [11538025] (QDL) [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:26 AM]
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Paul A. Garrahan (Oregon Department of Justice, 100 SW market Street, Portland, OR 97201) for Appellee State of Oregon. Date of service: 12/19/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11538019] [19-17480] (Garrahan, Paul) [Entered: 12/19/2019 08:24 AM]
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont Urgent Motion to extend time to file opposition until 01/03/2020. Date of service: 12/18/2019. [11537900] [19-17480] (Rumsey, Elizabeth) [Entered: 12/18/2019 09:41 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 16 Added Attorney(s) Steven Novick for party(s) Appellee State of Oregon, in case 19-17480. [11536261] (QDL) [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:52 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Steve Novick (Oregon Department of Justice, 100 SW Market Street, Portland, OR 97201) for Appellee State of Oregon. Date of service: 12/17/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11536198] [19-17480] (Novick, Steven) [Entered: 12/17/2019 04:40 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 Added Attorney(s) Rachel Fullmer for party(s) Appellee EDF, in case 19-17480. [11535970] (QDL) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:52 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel Elizabeth Fullmer (Environmental Defense Fund, 2060 Broadway, Ste 300, Boulder, CO 80302) for Appellee EDF. Date of service: 12/17/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11535944] [19-17480] (Fullmer, Rachel) [Entered: 12/17/2019 03:47 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellants USEPA and Andrew Wheeler Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 12/17/2019. [11535561] [19-17480] (Pepin, Joan) [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:08 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) William Grantham for party(s) Appellee State of New Mexico, in case 19-17480. [11535436] (QDL) [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:12 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William G. Grantham (New Mexico Attorney General, 201 3rd St. NW, Ste. 300, Albuquerque, NM 87102) for Appellee State of New Mexico. Date of service: 12/17/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11535431] [19-17480] (Grantham, William) [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:10 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Joan M. Pepin for party(s) Appellant Andrew Wheeler and Appellant USEPA, in case 19-17480. [11535378] (QDL) [Entered: 12/17/2019 12:59 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joan M. Pepin (U.S. Department of Justice, Environment & Natural Resources Division, P.O. Box 7415, Washington DC 20044-7415) for Appellants USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Date of service: 12/17/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11535176] [19-17480] (Pepin, Joan) [Entered: 12/17/2019 11:40 AM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Julia Kathryn Forgie for party(s) Appellee State of California, in case 19-17480. [11534285] (QDL) [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:48 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Julia Kathryn Forgie (California Attorney General's Office, 300 S. Spring St., Suite 1702, Los Angeles, CA 90013) for Appellee State of California. Date of service: 12/16/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11534282] [19-17480] (Forgie, Julia) [Entered: 12/16/2019 04:46 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Daniel Isaac Rottenberg for party(s) Appellee State of Illinois, in case 19-17480. [11533965] (QDL) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:09 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Isaac Rottenberg (Office of the Attorney General of the State of Illinois, 69 W. Washington St., Ste. 1800, Chicago, IL 60602) for Appellee State of Illinois. Date of service: 12/16/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11533947] [19-17480] (Rottenberg, Daniel) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:03 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Matthew Littleton for party(s) Appellee EDF, in case 19-17480. [11529104] (QDL) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:34 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew Littleton (Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton; 1008 Pennsylvania Ave SE, Washington, DC 20003) for Appellee EDF. Date of service: 12/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11529089] [19-17480] (Littleton, Matthew) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:31 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/18/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/09/2020. Transcript due 02/10/2020. Appellants U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler opening brief due 03/19/2020. Appellees Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Environmental Defense Fund, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Maryland, State of New Mexico, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island and State of Vermont answering brief due 04/20/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11528250] (RT) [Entered: 12/11/2019 09:19 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California, et al v. USEPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREW WHEELER, Acting Aministrator of the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Martha Mann
Represented By: Joan M. Pepin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Martha Mann
Represented By: Joan M. Pepin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: Joshua Morris Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: Daniel Isaac Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: William Grantham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: Michael Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Nicholas Persampieri
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF CALIFORNIA, by and through Attorney General Xavier Becerra and the California Air Resources Board
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: Timothy Eugene Sullivan
Represented By: Julia Kathryn Forgie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Rumsey
Represented By: Steven Novick
Represented By: Paul Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Matthew Littleton
Represented By: Susannah Weaver
Represented By: Peter Zalzal
Represented By: Rachel Fullmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. SCOTT PRUITT, Administrator, U.S. EPA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?