Anthony Weimer v. Google, Inc., et al

Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION, GOOGLE, INC. and MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY WEIMER
Case Number: 19-35009
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellant Anthony Weimer.Corrected reply to response to Court order dated 02/07/2019. Date of service: 02/25/2019. [11205473] [19-35009]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 02/26/2019 by SLM] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 02/25/2019 07:54 AM]
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellant Anthony Weimer reply to response to Court order dated 02/07/2019. Date of service: 02/22/2019. [11204153] [19-35009]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 02/26/2019 by SLM] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 02/22/2019 10:33 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellee Google, Inc. reply to response to Court order dated 02/07/2019. Date of service: 02/21/2019. [11202762] [19-35009] (Lopach, Paul) [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:38 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellant Anthony Weimer reply to response to Court order dated 02/07/2019. Date of service: 02/21/2019. [11202452] [19-35009]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 02/26/2019 by SLM] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:00 AM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Appellees DOJ and FCC reply to response to Court order dated 02/07/2019. Date of service: 02/19/2019. [11199330] [19-35009] (Francis, Victoria) [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:12 PM]
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Anthony Weimer. Date of service: 02/18/2019. [11198231] [19-35009] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 02/18/2019 01:07 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellant Anthony Weimer response to Court order dated 02/07/2019. Date of service: 02/11/2019. [11187780]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [8].] (SLM) [Entered: 02/12/2019 03:15 PM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 9 ]. Original Text: Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Anthony Weimer. Date of service: 02/11/2019. [11185600] [19-35009] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 02/11/2019 11:48 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Added attorney Nathan Bilyeu for Microsoft Corporation, in case 19-35009. [11184326] (CW) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:37 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nathan Dale Bilyeu; Tracy O. Zinsou for Appellee Microsoft Corporation. Date of service: 02/08/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11184286] [19-35009] (Bilyeu, Nathan) [Entered: 02/08/2019 02:13 PM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AGL): A review of the record reflects that this appeal may be frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), OR (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellees may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, and (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss this appeal or statement that the appeal should go forward. Appellants motion for joinder of party defendant (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) and supplemental motion for joinder of party defendant (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) will be addressed by separate order. [11183195] (AF) [Entered: 02/07/2019 04:19 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees DOJ and FCC response to motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/04/2019. [11178620] [19-35009] (Francis, Victoria) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:56 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Anthony Weimer Supplemental Motion for miscellaneous relief []. Date of service: 01/24/2019. [11165923] [19-35009] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 01/24/2019 04:12 PM]
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Anthony Weimer Urgent Motion for miscellaneous relief [MOTION FOR JOINDER OF PARTY DEFENDANT]. Date of service: 01/21/2019. [11160195] [19-35009] (Weimer, Anthony) [Entered: 01/21/2019 02:40 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Anthony Weimer opening brief due 03/05/2019. Appellees Federal Communications Commission, Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation and United States Department of Justice answering brief due 04/04/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11142993] (JMR) [Entered: 01/07/2019 09:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Weimer v. Google, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith Esquire
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOOGLE, INC.
Represented By: Paul J. Lopach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel Esquire
Represented By: Murry Warhank
Represented By: Nathan Bilyeu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY WEIMER
Represented By: Anthony Weimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?