Christine Ortega v. Nancy Berryhill
Defendant / Appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTINE JANE ORTEGA
Case Number: 19-35028
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Christine Jane Ortega to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Christine Jane Ortega opening brief due 04/11/2019. Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill answering brief due 05/13/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11220869] (JN) [Entered: 03/08/2019 10:00 AM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Christine Jane Ortega. New requested due date is 04/11/2019. [11220853] [19-35028] (Schneider, Merrill) [Entered: 03/08/2019 09:51 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the medation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11166446] (VS) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:32 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11159134] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Christine Jane Ortega Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11158252] [19-35028] (Schneider, Merrill) [Entered: 01/18/2019 08:50 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/18/2019. Appellant Christine Jane Ortega opening brief due 03/12/2019. Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill answering brief due 04/12/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11150231] (RT) [Entered: 01/11/2019 12:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine Ortega v. Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ryan Ta Lu Esquire
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTINE JANE ORTEGA
Represented By: Merrill Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?