Megan Elliott, et al v. Mason County, et al
Defendant / Appellee: RUSS OSTERHOUT, Chief Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, TREVOR SEVERANCE, Sergeant, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, RYAN SPURLING, Chief Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, NATHAN SMITH, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, BILL PHILPOTT, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, TIMOTHY RIPP II, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, JOEL NAULT, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, JOHN DOES, 1-10; individually and in their official capacities acting under the color of state law, JIM BARRETT, Under Sheriff, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, CASEY SALISBURY, Sheriff, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, MASON COUNTY, a political subdivision of the State of Washington, JEFFREY RHOADES, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, G. ALBERTSON, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law, ALFONSO MERCADO, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law and MATTHEW GRAY, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Plaintiff / Appellant: MEGAN ELLIOTT, in her personal capacity and MICHAEL B. SMITH, as administrator of the Estate of Tim Elliott, deceased
Case Number: 19-35105
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 04/17/2019. See order for details. [11244949] (LW) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:04 AM]
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Filed order MEDIATION (CG): There will be an in-person settlement conference in this matter on March 26, 2019, at 8:15 a.m. Pacific Time (9:00 a.m. for plaintiffs) at Ninth Circuit Mediation Office, William K. Nakamura United States Courthouse, 1010 Fifth Avenue, Seattle. (This is not the Stewart Street Courthouse.) [PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS] [11224865] (KRK) [Entered: 03/12/2019 02:28 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Added attorney David M. Jacobi for Joel Nault Trevor Severance G. Albertson Casey Salisbury Russ Osterhout Jeffrey Rhoades Nathan Smith Bill Philpott Timothy Ripp II Ryan Spurling Jim Barrett Matthew Gray Mason County Alfonso Mercado, in case 19-35105. [11216726] (CW) [Entered: 03/05/2019 01:44 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David M. Jacobi for Appellees G. Albertson, Jim Barrett, Matthew Gray, Mason County, Alfonso Mercado, Joel Nault, Russ Osterhout, Bill Philpott, Jeffrey Rhoades, Timothy Ripp, II, Casey Salisbury, Trevor Severance, Nathan Smith and Ryan Spurling. Date of service: 03/05/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11216510] [19-35105] (Jacobi, David) [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:24 PM]
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 03/19/2019. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. See order for details. [11216392] (LW) [Entered: 03/05/2019 11:47 AM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Lesli S. Wood for Joel Nault Trevor Severance G. Albertson Casey Salisbury Russ Osterhout Jeffrey Rhoades Nathan Smith Bill Philpott Timothy Ripp II Ryan Spurling Jim Barrett Matthew Gray Mason County Alfonso Mercado, in case 19-35105. [11213297] (JFF) [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:21 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lesli S. Wood for Appellees G. Albertson, Jim Barrett, Matthew Gray, Mason County, Alfonso Mercado, Joel Nault, Russ Osterhout, Bill Philpott, Jeffrey Rhoades, Timothy Ripp, II, Casey Salisbury, Trevor Severance, Nathan Smith and Ryan Spurling. Date of service: 03/01/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11213190] [19-35105] (Wood, Lesli) [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:54 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11198144] (AD) [Entered: 02/15/2019 06:44 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 03/05/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11197871] (LW) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:45 PM]
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Megan Elliott and Michael B. Smith Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/15/2019. [11192617] [19-35105] (Dreveskracht, Ryan) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:15 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/15/2019. Appellants Megan Elliott and Michael B. Smith opening brief due 04/08/2019. Appellees G. Albertson, Jim Barrett, Matthew Gray, John Does, Mason County, Alfonso Mercado, Joel Nault, Russ Osterhout, Bill Philpott, Jeffrey Rhoades, Timothy Ripp II, Casey Salisbury, Trevor Severance, Nathan Smith and Ryan Spurling answering brief due 05/08/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11183782] (RT) [Entered: 02/08/2019 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Megan Elliott, et al v. Mason County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSS OSTERHOUT, Chief Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TREVOR SEVERANCE, Sergeant, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN SPURLING, Chief Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATHAN SMITH, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL PHILPOTT, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY RIPP II, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL NAULT, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES, 1-10; individually and in their official capacities acting under the color of state law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM BARRETT, Under Sheriff, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASEY SALISBURY, Sheriff, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MASON COUNTY, a political subdivision of the State of Washington
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY RHOADES, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. ALBERTSON, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALFONSO MERCADO, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW GRAY, Deputy, Mason County Sheriff's Office, individually and in his official capacity acting under the color of state law
Represented By: Gary Allan Western
Represented By: Lesli S. Wood Esquire
Represented By: David M. Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MEGAN ELLIOTT, in her personal capacity
Represented By: Ryan Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S. Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL B. SMITH, as administrator of the Estate of Tim Elliott, deceased
Represented By: Ryan Dreveskracht
Represented By: Gabriel S. Galanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?