Pacific Rivers, et al v. BLM, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, an administrative agency of the United States Department of Interior, NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: ROSEBURG AREA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE, ZUBER & SONS LOGGING, LLC and TURNER LOGGING, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: OREGON WILD, COAST RANGE ASSOCIATION, THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY, INC., PACIFIC RIVERS, KLAMATH-SISKIYOU WILDLANDS CENTER, PACIFIC COAST FEDERATION OF FISHERMEN'S ASSOCIATIONS, UMPQUA WATERSHEDS, INC., INSTITUTE FOR FISHERIES RESOURCES and CASCADIA WILDLANDS
Case Number: 19-35384
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellants Pacific Rivers, Cascadia Wildlands, Coast Range Association, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Oregon Wild, The Wilderness Society, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Institute for Fisheries Resources and Umpqua Watersheds, Inc. Correspondence: Notice of No Transcript Ordered (from the district court). Date of service: 06/04/2019 [11319672] [19-35384] (Boyles, Kristen) [Entered: 06/04/2019 03:57 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Added attorney Jeffrey S. Beelaert for BLM United States Department of Interior NMFS United States Fish and Wildlife Service USDOC, in case 19-35384. [11319405] (NAC) [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:17 PM]
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey S. Beelaert for Appellees BLM, NMFS, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and USDOC. Date of service: 06/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11319391] [19-35384] (Beelaert, Jeffrey) [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:15 PM]
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11307149] (LW) [Entered: 05/23/2019 11:05 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Susan Jane McKibben Brown for Pacific Rivers Umpqua Watersheds, Inc. The Wilderness Society, Inc. Cascadia Wildlands Institute for Fisheries Resources Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations Coast Range Association Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center Oregon Wild, in case 19-35384. [11292999] (NAC) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:11 AM]
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Susan Jane McKibben Brown for Appellants Cascadia Wildlands, Coast Range Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Oregon Wild, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Pacific Rivers, The Wilderness Society, Inc. and Umpqua Watersheds, Inc.. Date of service: 05/10/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11292996] [19-35384] (Brown, Susan Jane) [Entered: 05/10/2019 09:09 AM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 05/22/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11292663] (LW) [Entered: 05/09/2019 03:55 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/09/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11292173] (AD) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:44 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Pacific Rivers, Cascadia Wildlands, Coast Range Association, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Oregon Wild, The Wilderness Society, Inc., Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Institute for Fisheries Resources and Umpqua Watersheds, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/09/2019. [11292131] [19-35384] (Parekh, Jaimini) [Entered: 05/09/2019 12:08 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/10/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/03/2019. Transcript due 07/02/2019. Appellants Cascadia Wildlands, Coast Range Association, Institute for Fisheries Resources, Klamath-Siskiyou Wildlands Center, Oregon Wild, Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations, Pacific Rivers, Umpqua Watersheds, Inc. and Wilderness Society opening brief due 08/12/2019. Appellees Bureau of Land Management, National Marine Fisheries Service, Roseburg Area Chamber of Commerce, Turner Logging, Inc., United States Department of Commerce, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Zuber & Sons Logging, LLC answering brief due 09/10/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11286372] (JBS) [Entered: 05/03/2019 02:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Rivers, et al v. BLM, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Beelaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Beelaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, an administrative agency of the United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Beelaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL MARINE FISHERIES SERVICE
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Beelaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Shaun M. Pettigrew
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Beelaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: ROSEBURG AREA CHAMBER OF COMMERCE
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Julie A. Weis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: ZUBER & SONS LOGGING, LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Julie A. Weis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: TURNER LOGGING, INC.
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Represented By: Julie A. Weis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OREGON WILD
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COAST RANGE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY, INC.
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PACIFIC RIVERS
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KLAMATH-SISKIYOU WILDLANDS CENTER
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PACIFIC COAST FEDERATION OF FISHERMEN'S ASSOCIATIONS
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: UMPQUA WATERSHEDS, INC.
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: INSTITUTE FOR FISHERIES RESOURCES
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CASCADIA WILDLANDS
Represented By: Susan Jane McKibben Brown
Represented By: Todd D. True
Represented By: Jaimini Parekh
Represented By: Kristen Lee Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?