League of Conservation Voters, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: GREENPEACE, INC., ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE, NORTHERN ALASKA ENVIRONMENTAL CENTER, THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY, RESISTING ENVIRONMENTAL DESTRUCTION ON INDIGENOUS LANDS, SIERRA CLUB, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY and LEAGUE OF CONSERVATION VOTERS
Defendant / Appellant: DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior, WILBUR ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce and DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE and STATE OF ALASKA
Case Number: 19-35460
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/26/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11369157] [19-35460, 19-35461, 19-35462] (BS) [Entered: 07/19/2019 09:31 AM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/17/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 07/11/2019 ). [11360660] [19-35460, 19-35461, 19-35462] (BS) [Entered: 07/11/2019 12:11 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/11/2019, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11340266] [19-35460, 19-35461, 19-35462] (BS) [Entered: 06/21/2019 09:58 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11312822] (AD) [Entered: 05/30/2019 06:44 AM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Bernhardt, Wilbur Ross and Donald J. Trump Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/30/2019. [11312814] [19-35460] (Heminger, Justin) [Entered: 05/30/2019 05:42 AM]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/05/2019. Transcript ordered by 06/27/2019. Transcript due 07/29/2019. Appellants David Bernhardt, Wilbur Ross and Donald J. Trump opening brief due 09/05/2019. Appellees Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Greenpeace, Inc., League of Conservation Voters, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Resisting Environmental Destruction On Indigenous Lands, Sierra Club and The Wilderness Society answering brief due 10/07/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11311430] (JBS) [Entered: 05/29/2019 09:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: League of Conservation Voters, et al v. Donald Trump, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GREENPEACE, INC.
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALASKA WILDERNESS LEAGUE
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NORTHERN ALASKA ENVIRONMENTAL CENTER
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE WILDERNESS SOCIETY
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RESISTING ENVIRONMENTAL DESTRUCTION ON INDIGENOUS LANDS
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SIERRA CLUB
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NATURAL RESOURCES DEFENSE COUNCIL
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEAGUE OF CONSERVATION VOTERS
Represented By: Nathaniel Lawrence
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Eric Paul Jorgensen Esquire
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe Esquire
Represented By: Nancy Sharman Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID BERNHARDT, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior
Represented By: Justin Heminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILBUR ROSS, in his official capacity as Secretary of Commerce
Represented By: Justin Heminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DONALD J. TRUMP, in his official capacity as President of the United States
Represented By: Justin Heminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: AMERICAN PETROLEUM INSTITUTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: STATE OF ALASKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?