Clarence Jones v. M. Rojas, et al
Defendant / Appellee: J. HOLLOPETER, In his Official and Individual Corridor Officer on Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, BILL DOMAN, in his official and individual capacity as acting assistant superintendent of correctional rehabilitation and senior supervisor of law library services and M. Rojas and H. Mackenzie at the Snake River Correctional Institution, MARK NOOTH, in his individual and official capacity as eastside institution administrator of the Oregon Department of Corrections, M. ROJAS, In her official and individual capacity as law librarian of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, J. BORGE, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Sergeant in Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, JERRY DOE, Sergeant, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Supervisor of C. Maret at the Snake River Correctional Institution, T. GREINER, In her Individual and Official Capacity as Grievance Officers at the Snake River Correctional Institution, BRAD CAIN, in his official and individual capacity as the functional unit manager and pre-hearing segregation officer, C. MARET, In her Official and Individual Capacity as Unit Officer of Unit C and E in the Complex at the Snake River Correctional Institution, MORDHOUST, Lieutentant Mordhoust In her Official and Individual Capacity as Officer-in-Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, FRANKS, Lieutentant, In her Official and Individual Capacity as Officer in Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, PAYNTER, Lieutentant, In his official and individual capacity as Officer-in-Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, WHITLEY, In his official and individual capacity as the Sergeant of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, MCNITT, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Corridor Officer at Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, H. MACKENZIE, in her official and individual capacity as supervisor of law library services and supervisor of M. Rojas at the Snake River Correctional Institution, GILBERTSON, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Assignment Captain and Approval of Complex Transfers, HOUSTON, Lieutentant, In his official and individual capacity as Reviewing Officer of Misconduct Report at the Snake River Correctional Institution, ANDERSON, Lieutentant, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Officer in Charge of Complex Three at the Snake River Correctional Institution, ANDRE JOHNSON, In his Individual Capacity as Inmate Legal Assistant at the Complex Two Law Library at the Snake River Correctional Institution, JANTZ, Lieutentant, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Officer-in-Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, GRAYES, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Unit Officer of Unit A at Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, JAMES TAYLOR, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Grievance and Discrimination Complaint Officer at the Snake River Correctional Institution, JOHN DOE, In his official and individual capacity as Pre-Hearing Segregation Designee Officer at the Snake River Correctional Institution, M. MORDHOUST, In his Individual and Official Capacity as Nephew of Lt. Mordhoust and Unit Officer of Unit A, Security Threat Management in Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, M. FUENTAS, In his official and individual capacity as Corridor Officer of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution, JANE DOE, In his or her Official and Individual Capacity of Transferring Brandon Thompson From Complex Two to Complex Three August 25, 2018 and JIM DOE, In his or her Official and Individual Capacity of Transferring Brandon Thompson From Complex Two to Complex Three August 25, 2018
Plaintiff / Appellant: CLARENCE EUGENE JONES, AKA Charles J. Johnson, AKA Charles James Johnson, AKA Asmar H. Saleem, AKA Asmar Habeeb-Ullah Saleem
Case Number: 19-35594
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Clarence Eugene Jones motion to extend time to file a response to motion to dismiss. Deficiencies: None. [11416994] (NAC) [Entered: 08/30/2019 01:58 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11414244] (RT) [Entered: 08/28/2019 04:21 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, MILAN D. SMITH, JR. and MARK J. BENNETT) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [11414188] (RT) [Entered: 08/28/2019 03:56 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees M. Fuentas, Houston, Paynter, M. Rojas and Whitley Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 08/16/2019. [11399520] [19-35594] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 08/16/2019 09:45 AM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Attorney Shannon M. Vincent in 19-35594 substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 19-35594 [11396641] (NAC) [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:40 AM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court St. NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees M. Rojas, Paynter, Houston, M. Fuentas and Whitley. Substitution for Attorney Shannon M. Vincent for Appellees M. Fuentas, Houston, Paynter, M. Rojas and Whitley. Date of service: 08/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11396629] [19-35594] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 08/14/2019 08:31 AM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Clarence Eugene Jones opening brief due 09/16/2019. Appellees Anderson, J. Borge, Brad Cain, Jane Doe, Jerry Doe, Jim Doe, John Doe, Bill Doman, Franks, M. Fuentas, Gilbertson, Grayes, T. Greiner, J. Hollopeter, Houston, Jantz, Andre Johnson, H. Mackenzie, C. Maret, McNitt, Mordhoust, M. Mordhoust, Mark Nooth, Paynter, M. Rojas, James Taylor and Whitley answering brief due 10/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11366942] (HC) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Clarence Jones v. M. Rojas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. HOLLOPETER, In his Official and Individual Corridor Officer on Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL DOMAN, in his official and individual capacity as acting assistant superintendent of correctional rehabilitation and senior supervisor of law library services and M. Rojas and H. Mackenzie at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK NOOTH, in his individual and official capacity as eastside institution administrator of the Oregon Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. ROJAS, In her official and individual capacity as law librarian of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BORGE, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Sergeant in Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERRY DOE, Sergeant, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Supervisor of C. Maret at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. GREINER, In her Individual and Official Capacity as Grievance Officers at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD CAIN, in his official and individual capacity as the functional unit manager and pre-hearing segregation officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. MARET, In her Official and Individual Capacity as Unit Officer of Unit C and E in the Complex at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORDHOUST, Lieutentant Mordhoust In her Official and Individual Capacity as Officer-in-Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANKS, Lieutentant, In her Official and Individual Capacity as Officer in Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAYNTER, Lieutentant, In his official and individual capacity as Officer-in-Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WHITLEY, In his official and individual capacity as the Sergeant of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCNITT, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Corridor Officer at Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. MACKENZIE, in her official and individual capacity as supervisor of law library services and supervisor of M. Rojas at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GILBERTSON, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Assignment Captain and Approval of Complex Transfers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOUSTON, Lieutentant, In his official and individual capacity as Reviewing Officer of Misconduct Report at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDERSON, Lieutentant, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Officer in Charge of Complex Three at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDRE JOHNSON, In his Individual Capacity as Inmate Legal Assistant at the Complex Two Law Library at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANTZ, Lieutentant, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Officer-in-Charge of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GRAYES, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Unit Officer of Unit A at Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES TAYLOR, In his Official and Individual Capacity as Grievance and Discrimination Complaint Officer at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, In his official and individual capacity as Pre-Hearing Segregation Designee Officer at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. MORDHOUST, In his Individual and Official Capacity as Nephew of Lt. Mordhoust and Unit Officer of Unit A, Security Threat Management in Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. FUENTAS, In his official and individual capacity as Corridor Officer of Complex Two at the Snake River Correctional Institution
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE, In his or her Official and Individual Capacity of Transferring Brandon Thompson From Complex Two to Complex Three August 25, 2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM DOE, In his or her Official and Individual Capacity of Transferring Brandon Thompson From Complex Two to Complex Three August 25, 2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLARENCE EUGENE JONES, AKA Charles J. Johnson, AKA Charles James Johnson, AKA Asmar H. Saleem, AKA Asmar Habeeb-Ullah Saleem
Represented By: Clarence Eugene Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?