Melissa Coury v. Foster Wheeler, LLC, et al
Defendant: MAR-DUSTRIAL SALES, INC., an Oregon corporation, CH MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC., an Oregon corporation, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, a New Jersey corporation, 3M COMPANY, a foreign corporation, AKA Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation, AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation, sued individually and as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, a New York corporation, CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, FKA Viacom, Inc., FKA Westinghouse Electric Corporation, successor-in-interest to BF Sturtevant, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., a Delaware corporation, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, successor in interest to Warren Pumps, Inc., Quimby Pumps Co., and Warren Steam Pumps Co. and FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE, INC., a Washington corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fraser Boiler Works
Plaintiff / Appellee: MELISSA COURY, Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Coury
Defendant / Appellant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, a New York corporation
Case Number: 19-35693
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/22/2019, 1:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 10/10/2019 ). [11450742] (BLS) [Entered: 10/01/2019 06:12 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant Foster Wheeler, LLC Correspondence: Ordering transcripts not needed for this appeal. Date of service: 09/16/2019 [11433211] [19-35693] (Marks, Christopher) [Entered: 09/16/2019 04:24 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/10/2019, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11432388] (BLS) [Entered: 09/16/2019 11:00 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 09/11/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11413092] (BLS) [Entered: 08/28/2019 09:42 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11407724][19-35693] (AD) [Entered: 08/22/2019 06:44 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Melissa Coury Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/22/2019. [11407188] [19-35693] (Mutnick, Jeffrey) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:34 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/19/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11401989][19-35693] (AD) [Entered: 08/19/2019 12:44 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Foster Wheeler, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/19/2019. [11401794] [19-35693] (Marks, Christopher) [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:35 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/22/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/16/2019. Transcript due 10/15/2019. Appellant Foster Wheeler, LLC opening brief due 11/25/2019. Appellee Melissa Coury answering brief due 12/23/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11398943] (JBS) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Melissa Coury v. Foster Wheeler, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAR-DUSTRIAL SALES, INC., an Oregon corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH MURPHY/CLARK-ULLMAN, INC., an Oregon corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, a New Jersey corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY, a foreign corporation, AKA Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR AND LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, a Pennsylvania corporation, sued individually and as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, a New York corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation, FKA Viacom, Inc., FKA Westinghouse Electric Corporation, successor-in-interest to BF Sturtevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC., a Delaware corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC, successor in interest to Warren Pumps, Inc., Quimby Pumps Co., and Warren Steam Pumps Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRASER'S BOILER SERVICE, INC., a Washington corporation, individually and as successor-in-interest to Fraser Boiler Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELISSA COURY, Personal Representative of the Estate of Raymond Coury
Represented By: Jeffrey Mutnick Esquire
Represented By: Elizabeth Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, a New York corporation
Represented By: Christopher S. Marks Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?