Emmanuel Adeyinka v. Brady Barrs, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ARMSTRONG, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE, BRADY BARRS and C. AQUILERA
Plaintiff / Appellant: EMMANUEL ADEWALE ADEYINKA
Case Number: 19-35763
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Streamlined request by Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka to extend time to file the brief is not approved because this appeal was closed as duplicative of pending appeal 19-35772. The briefing schedule in 19-35772 is stayed pending further order of the Court. [11492928] (JN) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:00 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON)This appeal No. 19-35763 challenges the magistrate judges August 19, 2019 order denying appellants motion for appointment of counsel. On August 20, 2019, the district court entered a final order dismissing the district court action, and entered a final judgment. Appellants appeal from the final judgment is pending as appeal No. 19-35772. Appellant may challenge the August 19, 2019 order denying appointment of counsel in the appeal from the final judgment. See Litchfield v. Spielberg, 736 F.2d 1352, 1355 (9th Cir. 1984) (an appeal from a final judgment draws into question all earlier, non-final orders and rulings that produced the judgment). This appeal No. 19-35763 is therefore dismissed as duplicative of pending appeal No. 19-35772. [11474445] (JBS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 11:01 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Received copy of motion filed in district court re: Motion for appointment of pro bono counsel. Motion filed by Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. [11451089] (RL) [Entered: 10/02/2019 10:15 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11426525] (CKP) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:51 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka opening brief due 11/04/2019. (No appearance for Appellees, no answering brief deadlines set) [11424469] (HC) [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emmanuel Adeyinka v. Brady Barrs, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARMSTRONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF CRIMINAL JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADY BARRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. AQUILERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EMMANUEL ADEWALE ADEYINKA
Represented By: Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?