Patrick Pizzella v. State of Alaska
Plaintiff: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Defendant / Appellant: STATE OF ALASKA, Department of Transportation and Public Facilities
Plaintiff / Appellee: PATRICK PIZZELLA, Acting Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor
Case Number: 19-35824
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 Streamlined request [10] by Appellant State of Alaska to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant State of Alaska opening brief due 12/26/2019. Appellee Patrick Pizzella answering brief due 01/27/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11503114] (BG) [Entered: 11/18/2019 04:48 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant State of Alaska. New requested due date is 12/26/2019. [11502864] [19-35824] (Demarest, Katherine) [Entered: 11/18/2019 03:31 PM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11476100] (LW) [Entered: 10/24/2019 11:06 AM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/23/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11457023] (MS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 04:46 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11455320][19-35824] (AD) [Entered: 10/04/2019 06:44 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellee Patrick Pizzella Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/04/2019. [11454605] [19-35824] (Goldberg, Rachel) [Entered: 10/04/2019 12:45 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Jennifer L. Sta.Ana in 19-35824 substituted by Attorney Rachel Goldberg in 19-35824 [11452976] (RR) [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:28 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rachel Goldberg (U.S. Department of Labor, 200 Constitution Ave., NW, Rm.N2716, Washington D.C. 20210) for Appellee Patrick Pizzella. Substitution for Attorney Jennifer L. Sta.Ana for Appellee Patrick Pizzella. Date of service: 10/03/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11452314] [19-35824] (Goldberg, Rachel) [Entered: 10/03/2019 06:46 AM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/02/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11451545][19-35824] (AD) [Entered: 10/02/2019 12:44 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant State of Alaska Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/02/2019. [11451193] [19-35824] (Demarest, Katherine) [Entered: 10/02/2019 10:51 AM]
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/04/2019. Appellant State of Alaska opening brief due 11/25/2019. Appellee Patrick Pizzella answering brief due 12/26/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11445790] (JPD) [Entered: 09/27/2019 09:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Pizzella v. State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. ALEXANDER ACOSTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STATE OF ALASKA, Department of Transportation and Public Facilities
Represented By: Katherine Demarest
Represented By: William E. Milks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICK PIZZELLA, Acting Secretary of Labor, United States Department of Labor
Represented By: Rachel Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?