Prayed v. USDOL, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: PRAYED
Defendant / Appellee: ALASKA RAILROAD CORPORATION, BRUCE M. SHELT, Interim President Local No. 183, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, Secretary of Labor R. Alexander Acosta and ALASKA RAILROAD WORKERS LOCAL 183
Case Number: 19-35830
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 Streamlined request by Appellant Prayed to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Prayed opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellees Alaska Railroad Corporation, Alaska Railroad Workers Local 183, Bruce M. Shelt and U.S. Department of Labor answering brief due 01/29/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11515868] (JN) [Entered: 11/29/2019 10:40 AM]
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Seth M. Beausang for party(s) Appellee USDOL, in case 19-35830. [11514672] (RR) [Entered: 11/27/2019 11:27 AM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Seth M. Beausang (U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Alaska Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse 222 West Seventh Avenue, #9, Room 253 Anchorage, Alaska 99513-7567) for Appellee USDOL. Date of service: 11/26/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11514052] [19-35830] (Beausang, Seth) [Entered: 11/26/2019 05:47 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Robert A. Royce for party(s) Appellee Alaska Railroad Workers Local 183 Appellee Alaska Railroad Corporation Appellee Bruce M. Shelt, in case 19-35830. [11455374] (ASW) [Entered: 10/05/2019 06:48 PM]
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert A. Royce (Jermain, Dunnagan & Owens, P.C., 3000 A Street, Suite 300, Anchorage, AK 99503) for Appellees Alaska Railroad Workers Local 183 and Bruce M. Shelt. Date of service: 10/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11455228] [19-35830] (Royce, Robert) [Entered: 10/04/2019 04:40 PM]
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Prayed opening brief due 11/29/2019. Appellees Alaska Railroad Corporation, Alaska Railroad Workers Local 183, Bruce M. Shelt and U.S. Department of Labor answering brief due 12/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11449648] (JPD) [Entered: 10/01/2019 09:30 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prayed v. USDOL, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PRAYED
Represented By: Prayed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALASKA RAILROAD CORPORATION
Represented By: William Evans
Represented By: Robert A. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRUCE M. SHELT, Interim President Local No. 183
Represented By: Sarah E. Josephson
Represented By: Robert A. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, Secretary of Labor R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Seth M. Beausang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALASKA RAILROAD WORKERS LOCAL 183
Represented By: Sarah E. Josephson
Represented By: Robert A. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?