Moi Michael v. Chihuly Studio, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MOI MICHAEL, an individual
Defendant / Appellee: LESLIE CHIHULY, individually and as a married person, DALE CHIHULY, individually and as a married person and CHIHULY STUDIO, INC., a Washington corporation
Case Number: 19-35852
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Streamlined request [7] by Appellant Moi Michael to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Moi Michael opening brief due 02/18/2020. Appellees Dale Chihuly, Leslie Chihuly and Chihuly Studio, Inc. answering brief due 03/19/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11520809] (JN) [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:54 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Moi Michael. New requested due date is 02/18/2020. [11520780] [19-35852] (Talmadge, Philip) [Entered: 12/04/2019 11:42 AM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Received copy of second amended notice of appeal from district court. [11499316] (RL) [Entered: 11/14/2019 02:03 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 12/04/2019. The conference scheduled for 11/13/19 is cancelled. See order for details. [11484748] (LW) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:29 AM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED DIAL IN- Assessment Conference, 11/13/2019, 1:30 p.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11466800] (LW) [Entered: 10/16/2019 03:41 PM]
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/14/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11463199][19-35852] (AD) [Entered: 10/14/2019 06:44 PM]
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Moi Michael Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/14/2019. [11463129] [19-35852] (Talmadge, Philip) [Entered: 10/14/2019 01:12 PM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/16/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/08/2019. Transcript due 12/09/2019. Appellant Moi Michael opening brief due 01/17/2020. Appellees Dale Chihuly, Leslie Chihuly and Chihuly Studio, Inc. answering brief due 02/18/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11459347] (JBS) [Entered: 10/09/2019 12:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moi Michael v. Chihuly Studio, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MOI MICHAEL, an individual
Represented By: Gary William Manca
Represented By: Philip A. Talmadge Esquire
Represented By: Lincoln Charles Beauregard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE CHIHULY, individually and as a married person
Represented By: Harry H. Schneider Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Susan Eileen Foster
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DALE CHIHULY, individually and as a married person
Represented By: Harry H. Schneider Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Susan Eileen Foster
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHIHULY STUDIO, INC., a Washington corporation
Represented By: Harry H. Schneider Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Susan Eileen Foster
Represented By: William C. Rava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?