Thurston Myers v. Thomas Brooks, et al
Defendant: COREY WILLIAMS, Detective, JANE DOES, Brooks, Mason, Williams, Jensen,1-34, STEVEN JENSEN, Police Chief and JOHN DOES, 1-34
Plaintiff / Appellant: THURSTON MYERS
Defendant / Appellee: JEFFREY MASON, Detective Sergeant, THOMAS J. BROOKS, Sergeant and CITY OF LYNNWOOD
Case Number: 19-35869
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellants motion [ # 3 ] for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief is due February 10, 2020. The answering brief is due March 11, 2020. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11521475] (LBS) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:07 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Thurston Myers motion to extend time to file appellant opening brief until 02/10/2020. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/28/2019. [11519900] (QDL) [Entered: 12/03/2019 03:47 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Thurston Myers opening brief due 12/16/2019. Appellees Thomas J. Brooks, City of Lynnwood and Jeffrey Mason answering brief due 01/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11466828] (JPD) [Entered: 10/16/2019 03:49 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11466647] (JPD) [Entered: 10/16/2019 02:58 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurston Myers v. Thomas Brooks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THURSTON MYERS
Represented By: Thurston Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREY WILLIAMS, Detective
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES, Brooks, Mason, Williams, Jensen,1-34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN JENSEN, Police Chief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES, 1-34
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY MASON, Detective Sergeant
Represented By: Thomas P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS J. BROOKS, Sergeant
Represented By: Thomas P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF LYNNWOOD
Represented By: Thomas P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?