Mark Daviscourt v. Gwannette Claybrook, et al
Defendant / Appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN ASSISTANT U.S. ATTORNEYS, T. B. JONES, (COIC) Group Manager, BRYAN STEBBINS, Southwest Washington Representative, Office of U.S. Senator Patty Murray, YAEL BORTNICK, Trial Attorney, Tax Division, U.S. Department of Justice, G. MOHR, (COIC) Tax Examiner, ERIC SMITH, IRS Collection Supervisor, AS YET UNKNOWN IRS OCC PERSONNEL, AS YET UNKNOWN AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS OF THE OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL FOR THE U S DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, AS YET UNKNOWN SPECIAL AGENTS, AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS OF THE OFFICE OF THE TREASURY INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR TAX ADMINISTRATION, ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS, acting in their individual capacities, ANN T. BROWN, Operations Manager, IRS Centralized Offers in Compromise (COIC), GWANNETTE M. CLAYBROOK, Acting Director, IRS Western Area Collection, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PATRICIA L. DAVIS, IRS Appeals Advisor, AS YET UNKNOWN AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS OF THE IRS OFFICE OF APPEALS, KIMBERLY LEWIS, IRS Appeals Advisor, STEVE BAKER, IRS Revenue Officer, AS YET UNKNOWN (COIC) AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS, MICHAEL ISENBERG, Special Agent, Treasury Office of Investigations and B. CAMPBELL, (COIC) Offer Specialist
Plaintiff / Appellant: MARK DAVISCOURT
Case Number: 19-35873
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Streamlined request by Appellant Mark Daviscourt to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Mark Daviscourt opening brief due 01/15/2020. Appellees All Known and Unknown Defendants, As Yet Unknown (COIC) Agents, Officers and Officials, As Yet Unknown Agents, Officers and Officials of the IRS Office of Appeals, As Yet Unknown Agents, Officers and Officials of the Office of General Counsel for the U S Department of Treasury, As Yet Unknown Assistant U.S. Attorneys, As Yet Unknown IRS OCC Personnel, As Yet Unknown Special Agents, Agents, Officers and Officials of the Office of the Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration, Steve Baker, Yael Bortnick, Ann T. Brown, B. Campbell, Gwannette M. Claybrook, Patricia L. Davis, Michael Isenberg, T. B. Jones, Kimberly Lewis, G. Mohr, Eric Smith, Bryan Stebbins and United States of America answering brief due 02/14/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11501989] (JN) [Entered: 11/18/2019 11:14 AM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Terminated Rika Valdman for USA, Bryan Stebbins, Eric Smith, G. Mohr, Kimberly Lewis, T. B. Jones, Michael Isenberg, Patricia L. Davis, Gwannette M. Claybrook, B. Campbell, Ann T. Brown, Yael Bortnick and Steve Baker in 19-35873 (for failure to register for Appellate ECF) [11483824] (JBS) [Entered: 10/30/2019 03:29 PM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Robert Joel Branman for party(s) Appellee Steve Baker Appellee Michael Isenberg Appellee USA Appellee G. Mohr Appellee B. Campbell Appellee Patricia L. Davis Appellee Gwannette M. Claybrook Appellee Yael Bortnick Appellee Ann T. Brown Appellee Eric Smith Appellee Bryan Stebbins Appellee T. B. Jones Appellee Kimberly Lewis, in case 19-35873. [11478009] (QDL) [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:40 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Robert J. Branman (U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Appellate Section, Post Office Box 502, Washington, DC 20044) for Appellees Steve Baker, Yael Bortnick, Ann T. Brown, B. Campbell, Gwannette M. Claybrook, Patricia L. Davis, Michael Isenberg, T. B. Jones, Kimberly Lewis, G. Mohr, Eric Smith, Bryan Stebbins and USA. Date of service: 10/25/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11477964] [19-35873] (Branman, Robert) [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:31 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/16/2019. [11467877] (HH) [Entered: 10/17/2019 11:18 AM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Mark Daviscourt opening brief due 12/16/2019. Appellees All Known and Unknown Defendants, As Yet Unknown (COIC) Agents, Officers and Officials, As Yet Unknown Agents, Officers and Officials of the IRS Office of Appeals, As Yet Unknown Agents, Officers and Officials of the Office of General Counsel for the U S Department of Treasury, As Yet Unknown Assistant U.S. Attorneys, As Yet Unknown IRS OCC Personnel, As Yet Unknown Special Agents, Agents, Officers and Officials of the Office of the Treasury Inspector General for Tax Administration, Steve Baker, Yael Bortnick, Ann T. Brown, B. Campbell, Gwannette M. Claybrook, Patricia L. Davis, Michael Isenberg, T. B. Jones, Kimberly Lewis, G. Mohr, Eric Smith, Bryan Stebbins and United States of America answering brief due 01/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11467598] (JMR) [Entered: 10/17/2019 09:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Daviscourt v. Gwannette Claybrook, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN ASSISTANT U.S. ATTORNEYS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. B. JONES, (COIC) Group Manager
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRYAN STEBBINS, Southwest Washington Representative, Office of U.S. Senator Patty Murray
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YAEL BORTNICK, Trial Attorney, Tax Division, U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. MOHR, (COIC) Tax Examiner
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC SMITH, IRS Collection Supervisor
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN IRS OCC PERSONNEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS OF THE OFFICE OF GENERAL COUNSEL FOR THE U S DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN SPECIAL AGENTS, AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS OF THE OFFICE OF THE TREASURY INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR TAX ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALL KNOWN AND UNKNOWN DEFENDANTS, acting in their individual capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANN T. BROWN, Operations Manager, IRS Centralized Offers in Compromise (COIC)
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GWANNETTE M. CLAYBROOK, Acting Director, IRS Western Area Collection
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA L. DAVIS, IRS Appeals Advisor
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS OF THE IRS OFFICE OF APPEALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIMBERLY LEWIS, IRS Appeals Advisor
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE BAKER, IRS Revenue Officer
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AS YET UNKNOWN (COIC) AGENTS, OFFICERS AND OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL ISENBERG, Special Agent, Treasury Office of Investigations
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. CAMPBELL, (COIC) Offer Specialist
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK DAVISCOURT
Represented By: Mark Daviscourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?