William Nietzche, et al v. Freedom Home Mortgage Corp., et al
Defendant / Appellee: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P., MARK K. PASSANANTE, In both personal and professional capacities, BENEFICIAL OREGON, INC., STATE OF OREGON CORPORATION, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, HSBC HOLDINGS, PLC, RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, UHD HOLDINGS, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., RAIN CITY CAPITAL OF OREGON, LLC, URBAN HOUSING DEVELOPMENT, LLC, BENEFICIAL FINANCIAL, FREEDOM HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION, CLEAR RECON CORPORATION, HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION, BARRISTERS SUPPORT SERVICES, HSBC HOME EQUITY LOAN CORPORATION, DOES, 1 through 100 inclusive, U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., As trustee for securitized trust HSBC Trust HSBC Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-1 Trust, ROMAN OZERUGA, In both personal and professional capacities, FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION, REGIONAL TRUSTEE SERVICES CORPORATION, GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC., As owner of MTGLQ, UNITED STATES CORPORATION COMPANY and TERRANCE J. SLOMINSKI, In both personal and professional capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIAM X. NIETZCHE, solely as trustee for KRME International Trust, WILLIAM KINNEY, Jr. and JULIE A. METCALF KINNEY
Case Number: 19-35876
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Garrett S. Garfield for party(s) Appellee Freedom Home Mortgage Corporation, Appellee Freedom Mortgage Corporation and Appellee MERS, in case 19-35876. [11495834] (QDL) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:27 AM]
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Garrett S. Garfield (Holland & Knight LLP, 111 SW 5th Avenue, Suite 2300, Portland, OR 97204) for Appellees Freedom Home Mortgage Corporation, Freedom Mortgage Corporation and MERS. Date of service: 11/11/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11495107] [19-35876] (Garfield, Garrett) [Entered: 11/11/2019 11:29 AM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant William Kinney, Jr. Correspondence: Notice of Removal. Date of service: 10/31/2019. [11485539] [19-35876]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 11/19/2019 by SLM] (Kinney, William) [Entered: 10/31/2019 09:15 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Filed order (WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JOHNNIE B. RAWLINSON) The emergency motion entitled petition for a bill of quia timet for preemptory mandate is denied (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]). The emergency motions for injunctive relief (Docket Entry Nos. [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ]) are denied as moot. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11485153] (JMR) [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:40 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant William Kinney, Jr. EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [petition for a bill of quia timet]. Date of service: 10/31/2019. [11484846] [19-35876]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 10/31/2019 by SLM] (Kinney, William) [Entered: 10/31/2019 12:07 PM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Attorney Nathaniel Aggrey in 19-35876 substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck in 19-35876 [11474181] (QDL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:31 AM]
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellee State of Oregon Corporation. Substitution for Attorney Nathaniel Aggrey for Appellee State of Oregon Corporation. Date of service: 10/23/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11474156] [19-35876] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:21 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellants Julie A. Metcalf Kinney and William X. Nietzche supplemental EMERGENCY motion for preliminary injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/18/2019. [11473504] (QDL) [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:50 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Appellants Julie A. Metcalf Kinney and William X. Nietzche EMERGENCY motion for preliminary injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on 10/17/2019. [11469960] (QDL) [Entered: 10/18/2019 02:41 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/14/2019. Transcript due 12/16/2019. Appellants William Kinney Jr., Julie A. Metcalf Kinney and William X. Nietzche opening brief due 01/23/2020. Appellees Barristers Support Services, Beneficial Financial, Beneficial Oregon, Inc., Clear Recon Corporation, Does, Freedom Home Mortgage Corporation, Freedom Mortgage Corporation, Goldman Sachs Group Inc., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings, PLC, HSBC Home Equity Loan Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mtglq Investors, L.P., Roman Ozeruga, Mark K. Passanante, Rain City Capital of Oregon, LLC, Regional Trustee Services Corporation, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Terrance J. Slominski, State of Oregon Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., UHD Holdings, United States Corporation Company and Urban Housing Development, LLC answering brief due 02/24/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11468446] (JBS) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Nietzche, et al v. Freedom Home Mortgage Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin Hisashi Kono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK K. PASSANANTE, In both personal and professional capacities
Represented By: Matthew Kalmanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BENEFICIAL OREGON, INC.
Represented By: Pilar Cortwright French Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE OF OREGON CORPORATION
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael John Farrell
Represented By: Thomas Winfred Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC HOLDINGS, PLC
Represented By: Pilar Cortwright French Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Michael John Farrell
Represented By: Thomas Winfred Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UHD HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Nellie Q. Barnard
Represented By: David J. Elkanich
Represented By: Garrett S. Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAIN CITY CAPITAL OF OREGON, LLC
Represented By: Michael John Farrell
Represented By: Thomas Winfred Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: URBAN HOUSING DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: David Venables
Represented By: Terrance J. Slominski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BENEFICIAL FINANCIAL
Represented By: Pilar Cortwright French Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FREEDOM HOME MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: Nellie Q. Barnard
Represented By: David J. Elkanich
Represented By: Garrett S. Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLEAR RECON CORPORATION
Represented By: Peter J. Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC FINANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Pilar Cortwright French Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRISTERS SUPPORT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC HOME EQUITY LOAN CORPORATION
Represented By: Pilar Cortwright French Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., As trustee for securitized trust HSBC Trust HSBC Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-1 Trust
Represented By: Michael John Farrell
Represented By: Thomas Winfred Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROMAN OZERUGA, In both personal and professional capacities
Represented By: David Venables
Represented By: Terrance J. Slominski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: Nellie Q. Barnard
Represented By: David J. Elkanich
Represented By: Garrett S. Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGIONAL TRUSTEE SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GOLDMAN SACHS GROUP INC., As owner of MTGLQ
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES CORPORATION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRANCE J. SLOMINSKI, In both personal and professional capacities
Represented By: Matthew Kalmanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM X. NIETZCHE, solely as trustee for KRME International Trust
Represented By: William X. Nietzche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM KINNEY, Jr.
Represented By: William Kinney Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIE A. METCALF KINNEY
Represented By: Julie A. Metcalf Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?