John Entler v. Steven Sinclair, et al
Defendant: BERNIE WARNER, RODNEY SHUMATE, Bar Unit Manager, D. JACKSON, Major Hearings Officer, LUCY HENDERSON, CHRISTINE GREGOIRE, CHRISTOPHER BOWMAN, Associate Superintendent, JOHN/JANE DOES, 1-100, R. WILLIAMS, Lieutenant, KENNETH DAVENPORT, Bar Unit Sergeant, NATHAN SHATTO, Bar Unit Curio Officer, JOANN IRWIN-MCCOY, Bar Unit Counselor, DEBORAH CREESLEY-LUKE, Corrections Officer, STEVEN FLEENOR, Mailroom Sergeant, SCOTT FRAKES, Assistant Secretary of Department of Corrections, KIRK JESSEE, Bar Unit Sergeant, CARRIE MEYER, Secretary of Department of Corrections and DANIEL BAYER, Lieutenant
Defendant / Appellee: STEVEN SINCLAIR, Secretary of Department of Corrections, PIERCE, Major Hearings Officer, AKA G. Pierce, RON KNIGHT and LYNN IRISH CLARK, Bar Unit Manager
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN THOMAS ENTLER
Case Number: 19-35890
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS and DANIEL A. BRESS) Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ] is denied because appellant has had three or more prior actions or appeals dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, and appellant has not alleged imminent danger of serious physical injury. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay $505.00 to the district court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and file proof of payment with this court. Failure to pay the fees will result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute, regardless of further filings. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of the denial of appellants in forma pauperis status shall be entertained. If the appeal is dismissed for failure to comply with this order, the court will not entertain any motion to reinstate the appeal that is not accompanied by proof of payment of the docketing and filing fees. Briefing is suspended pending further order of this court. [11538990] (JPD) [Entered: 12/19/2019 04:12 PM]
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant John Thomas Entler reply to response to motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. [11497004] (NAC) [Entered: 11/13/2019 07:51 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellees Lynn Irish Clark, Ron Knight, Pierce and Steven Sinclair response to motion ([ # 3 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 10/29/2019. [11481144] [19-35890] (Feulner, Timothy) [Entered: 10/29/2019 09:38 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/22/2019. Denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis. [11477941] (NAC) [Entered: 10/25/2019 11:23 AM]
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 11/20/2019. Transcript due 12/20/2019. Appellant John Thomas Entler opening brief due 01/29/2020. Appellees Lynn Irish Clark, Ron Knight, Pierce and Steven Sinclair answering brief due 02/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11476340] (HC) [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Entler v. Steven Sinclair, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNIE WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY SHUMATE, Bar Unit Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. JACKSON, Major Hearings Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCY HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE GREGOIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER BOWMAN, Associate Superintendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES, 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. WILLIAMS, Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH DAVENPORT, Bar Unit Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHAN SHATTO, Bar Unit Curio Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANN IRWIN-MCCOY, Bar Unit Counselor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH CREESLEY-LUKE, Corrections Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN FLEENOR, Mailroom Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT FRAKES, Assistant Secretary of Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRK JESSEE, Bar Unit Sergeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIE MEYER, Secretary of Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BAYER, Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN SINCLAIR, Secretary of Department of Corrections
Represented By: Timothy J. Feulner Esquire
Represented By: Cassie B. vanRoojen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PIERCE, Major Hearings Officer, AKA G. Pierce
Represented By: Timothy J. Feulner Esquire
Represented By: Cassie B. vanRoojen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RON KNIGHT
Represented By: Timothy J. Feulner Esquire
Represented By: Cassie B. vanRoojen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYNN IRISH CLARK, Bar Unit Manager
Represented By: Timothy J. Feulner Esquire
Represented By: Cassie B. vanRoojen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN THOMAS ENTLER
Represented By: John Thomas Entler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?