Daniel Matthews v. Debra Hascall, et al
Defendant: CITY OF PENDLETON, COUNTY OF UMATILLA, OR, Individually and in their official capacities
Defendant / Appellee: J. PECK, Assistant Superintendent at EOCI, MITCH MORROW, Deputy Director of ODOC, RILEY, Correctional Officer at EOCI, ADRIAN O'CONNOR, Internal Audit Admin, ODOC, RAMEY, Sergeant at EOCI, BRIAN BELLEQUE, Deputy Director of ODOC, H. NEVIL, Hearings Officer at EOCI, ELIZABETH CRAIG, Administrator of ODOC, COLETTE PETERS, Director of ODOC, DEBRA HASCALL, Law Library Secretary, EOCI, KIM BROCKAMP, Deputy Director of ODOC, BIRDIE JANET WORLEY, Rules Coordinator, ODOC, NINA SOBOTTA, Grievance Coordinator at EOCI, LEMENS, Assistant Superintendent at EOCI and J. TAYLOR, Superintendent Eastern Oregon Correctional Institution
Plaintiff / Appellant: DANIEL J. MATTHEWS
Case Number: 19-35949
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner completed authorization fee order. [11539979] (CKP) [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:36 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 12/10/2019. [Case Number 19-35949: Partially Paid] [11537565] (JFF) [Entered: 12/18/2019 03:24 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Terminated Shannon M. Vincent for Birdie Janet Worley, J. Taylor, Nina Sobotta, Riley, Ramey, Colette Peters, J. Peck, Adrian O'Connor, H. Nevil, Mitch Morrow, Lemens, Debra Hascall, Elizabeth Craig, Kim Brockamp and Brian Belleque in 19-35949, Parties have substitute counsel. [11524272] (SVG) [Entered: 12/06/2019 03:09 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Denise Gale Fjordbeck for party(s) Appellee Colette Peters Appellee J. Taylor Appellee Ramey Appellee Riley Appellee Elizabeth Craig Appellee Birdie Janet Worley Appellee H. Nevil Appellee Brian Belleque Appellee Adrian O'Connor Appellee Debra Hascall Appellee Nina Sobotta Appellee Kim Brockamp Appellee Mitch Morrow Appellee Lemens Appellee J. Peck, in case 19-35949. [11524118] (JFF) [Entered: 12/06/2019 02:13 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Brian Belleque, Kim Brockamp, Elizabeth Craig, Debra Hascall, Lemens, Mitch Morrow, H. Nevil, Adrian O'Connor, J. Peck, Colette Peters, Ramey, Riley, Nina Sobotta, J. Taylor and Birdie Janet Worley. Substitution for Attorney Shannon M. Vincent for Appellees Brian Belleque, Kim Brockamp, Elizabeth Craig, Debra Hascall, Lemens, Mitch Morrow, H. Nevil, Adrian O'Connor, J. Peck, Colette Peters, Ramey, Riley, Nina Sobotta, J. Taylor and Birdie Janet Worley. Date of service: 12/06/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11523658] [19-35949] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:45 AM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11507865] (CKP) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:49 PM]
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Daniel J. Matthews opening brief due 01/13/2020. Appellees Brian Belleque, Kim Brockamp, Elizabeth Craig, Debra Hascall, Lemens, Mitch Morrow, H. Nevil, Adrian O'Connor, J. Peck, Colette Peters, Ramey, Riley, Nina Sobotta, J. Taylor and Birdie Janet Worley answering brief due 02/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11497803] (JMR) [Entered: 11/13/2019 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Matthews v. Debra Hascall, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PENDLETON, COUNTY OF UMATILLA, OR, Individually and in their official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. PECK, Assistant Superintendent at EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MITCH MORROW, Deputy Director of ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RILEY, Correctional Officer at EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADRIAN O'CONNOR, Internal Audit Admin, ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAMEY, Sergeant at EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN BELLEQUE, Deputy Director of ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H. NEVIL, Hearings Officer at EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELIZABETH CRAIG, Administrator of ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLETTE PETERS, Director of ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBRA HASCALL, Law Library Secretary, EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIM BROCKAMP, Deputy Director of ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BIRDIE JANET WORLEY, Rules Coordinator, ODOC
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NINA SOBOTTA, Grievance Coordinator at EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEMENS, Assistant Superintendent at EOCI
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. TAYLOR, Superintendent Eastern Oregon Correctional Institution
Represented By: Shannon M. Vincent
Represented By: Denise Gale Fjordbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL J. MATTHEWS
Represented By: Daniel J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?