Anthony Myers v. Troy Bacon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JOHN DOE, 1 - Officer, 2nd Shift (10 South) on - Activites, King County Jail, JOHN DOE, 2 - Officer, 1st Shift (10 South) on - Activites, King County Jail, FRIDA MORALES OCHOA, Kitchen Cook/Baker, King County Jail, ROZELL BELEFORD, Officer, King County Jail, GARRETT FERREIRO, Sergeant, Internal Investigations Unit, King County Jail, CHELSEA TROUTMAN, Kitchen Cook/Baker, King County Jail, JOHN DOE, 4 - Correction Program Specialist; - Contradiction Hearing, King County Jail, KELLY N. WASHINGTON, Grievance Coordinator, King County Jail, JOHN DOE, 3 - Officer, 2nd Shift (10 South) on - Activites, King County Jail, KATHERINE MARCIANA ORTH, Sergeant, King County Jail, TAMRA CULVER, Kitchen Staff Supervisor (Cook/Baker Lead), King County Jail and TROY ADAM BACON, Captain, King County Jail
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY ALLEN MYERS
Case Number: 19-35958
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court order filed on 11/22/2019 ORDER revoking in forma pauperis status. [11509345] (RL) [Entered: 11/22/2019 02:49 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [11507768] (CKP) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:31 PM]
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Anthony Allen Myers opening brief due 01/13/2020. [11500225] (JPD) [Entered: 11/15/2019 10:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Myers v. Troy Bacon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, 1 - Officer, 2nd Shift (10 South) on - Activites, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, 2 - Officer, 1st Shift (10 South) on - Activites, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRIDA MORALES OCHOA, Kitchen Cook/Baker, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROZELL BELEFORD, Officer, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARRETT FERREIRO, Sergeant, Internal Investigations Unit, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHELSEA TROUTMAN, Kitchen Cook/Baker, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, 4 - Correction Program Specialist; - Contradiction Hearing, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY N. WASHINGTON, Grievance Coordinator, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, 3 - Officer, 2nd Shift (10 South) on - Activites, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE MARCIANA ORTH, Sergeant, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAMRA CULVER, Kitchen Staff Supervisor (Cook/Baker Lead), King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TROY ADAM BACON, Captain, King County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY ALLEN MYERS
Represented By: Anthony Allen Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?