Calvin Malone v. Leslie Sziebert
Plaintiff / Appellant: CALVIN MALONE
Defendant / Appellee: LESLIE SZIEBERT, Washington State Special Commitment Center Chief Medical Director
Case Number: 19-36038
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Received notice of change of address dated from Calvin Malone. New address: 3249-39th Way N.E Olympia, WA 98507. [11530761] --[Edited: Updated Address. 12/12/2019 by TYL] (JFF) [Entered: 12/12/2019 04:21 PM]
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [11528114] (CKP) [Entered: 12/11/2019 08:09 AM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Calvin Malone opening brief due 02/04/2020. Appellee Leslie Sziebert answering brief due 03/05/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11526802] (JPD) [Entered: 12/10/2019 09:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvin Malone v. Leslie Sziebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALVIN MALONE
Represented By: Calvin Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LESLIE SZIEBERT, Washington State Special Commitment Center Chief Medical Director
Represented By: Gregory G. Silvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?