SOS Co., Inc., et al v. E-Collar Technologies, Inc., et al
Defendant: C&D MICRO CO., LTD., a Republic of Korea corporation and GREG VAN CUREN, an individual
Plaintiff / Appellant: DOGTRA CO., LTD., a Republic of Korea corporation and SOS CO., INC., DBA Dogtra
Defendant / Appellee: E-COLLAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC., an Indiana corporation and HOSUNG SO, an individual
Case Number: 19-55014
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11191070] (CL) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:47 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/12/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11171566] (CL) [Entered: 01/29/2019 02:42 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/11/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11150938] (AD) [Entered: 01/11/2019 06:44 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Dogtra Co., Ltd. and SOS Co., Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/11/2019. [11150646] [19-55014] (Chen, Alan) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:02 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/01/2019. Transcript due 03/04/2019. Appellants Dogtra Co., Ltd. and SOS Co., Inc. opening brief due 04/12/2019. Appellees E-Collar Technologies, Inc. and Hosung So answering brief due 05/13/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11141793] (RT) [Entered: 01/04/2019 12:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOS Co., Inc., et al v. E-Collar Technologies, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&D MICRO CO., LTD., a Republic of Korea corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREG VAN CUREN, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOGTRA CO., LTD., a Republic of Korea corporation
Represented By: Alan C. Chen Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOS CO., INC., DBA Dogtra
Represented By: Alan C. Chen Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E-COLLAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC., an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HOSUNG SO, an individual
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?