American Bankers Insurance Co. v. Angel Velazquez, et al

Defendant: HERALDO RUESCH
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Defendant / Appellee: ANGEL VELAZQUEZ
Case Number: 19-55024
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11186670] (VS) [Entered: 02/12/2019 08:13 AM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida Correspondence: NOTICE THAT NO TRANSCRIPTS WILL BE ORDERED FOR PURPOSES OF APPEAL (copy of notice to district court per Cir. R. 10-3.1(c)). Date of service: 02/01/2019 [11176837] [19-55024] (Williams, Jeffrey) [Entered: 02/01/2019 04:57 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/11/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11158527] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:59 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/09/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11147729] (AD) [Entered: 01/09/2019 06:44 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/09/2019. [11147289] [19-55024] (Williams, Jeffrey) [Entered: 01/09/2019 03:00 PM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 01/09/2019. [11147279] [19-55024] (Williams, Jeffrey) [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:59 PM]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/14/2019. Transcript ordered by 02/04/2019. Transcript due 03/05/2019. Appellant American Bankers Insurance Company of Florida opening brief due 04/15/2019. Appellee Angel Velazquez answering brief due 05/14/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11143354] (HC) [Entered: 01/07/2019 11:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Bankers Insurance Co. v. Angel Velazquez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Scott Laes
Represented By: Jeffrey N. Williams
Represented By: Raymond J. Tittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERALDO RUESCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGEL VELAZQUEZ
Represented By: Robert Lee Booker Esquire II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?