David Grigsby, et al v. BofI Holding, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: DAVID SIEBERT and BAR MANDALEVY
Petitioner: BOFI INVESTORS GROUP, CHAO WANG, PHILIP RICCIARDI, LINDA OSTERMANN, VICKIE SIEBERT and LARRY L. DOOLEY
Defendant / Appellee: GREGORY GARRABRANTS, BOFI HOLDING, INC., ESHEL BAR-ADON, PAUL J. GRINBERG and ANDREW J. MICHELETTI
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID GRIGSBY and JOSEPH SHEPARD, On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated
Case Number: 19-55042
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 17 ] submitted by David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 18 ] submitted by David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11218358] (SML) [Entered: 03/06/2019 02:20 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard Motion to take judicial notice of Exhibit A: A true and correct printout of a webpage titled UCC Search from the State of Delaware, Division of Corporations website, available at https://corp.delaware.gov/uccsearch.shtml. Date of service: 03/06/2019. [11218313] [19-55042] (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Entered: 03/06/2019 01:59 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 03/06/2019. [11218306] [19-55042] (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Entered: 03/06/2019 01:53 PM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 03/06/2019. [11218298] [19-55042] (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Entered: 03/06/2019 01:47 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 Added attorney Adam M. Apton, Adam McCall for David Grigsby Joseph Shepard, in case 19-55042. [11213432] (JFF) [Entered: 03/01/2019 03:13 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam Christopher McCall for Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 03/01/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11213221] [19-55042] (McCall, Adam) [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:02 PM]
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Adam M. Apton for Appellants Joseph Shepard and David Grigsby. Date of service: 03/01/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11212911] [19-55042] (Apton, Adam) [Entered: 03/01/2019 11:57 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Added attorney Jennifer Banner Sobers for David Grigsby Joseph Shepard, in case 19-55042. [11206710] (JFF) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:24 PM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jennifer Banner Sobers for Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 02/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11206243] [19-55042] (Sobers, Jennifer) [Entered: 02/25/2019 12:52 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Added attorney Emma Gilmore for David Grigsby Joseph Shepard, in case 19-55042. [11202530] (JFF) [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:26 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Emma Gilmore for Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 02/21/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11202375] [19-55042] (Gilmore, Emma) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:33 AM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11202117] (VS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 08:58 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/05/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11158877] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 11:08 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/15/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11154546] (AD) [Entered: 01/15/2019 06:44 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees Gregory Garrabrants, Eshel Bar-Adon, BofI Holding, Inc., Paul J. Grinberg and Andrew J. Micheletti Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11154215] [19-55042] (Stigi, John) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:45 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Brenda Szydlo for Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 01/11/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11149546] [19-55042]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect attorney filer. 01/11/2019 by RY] (Szydlo, Brenda) [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:39 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeremy A. Lieberman for Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard. Date of service: 01/11/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11149516] [19-55042] (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Entered: 01/11/2019 08:27 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11148515] (AD) [Entered: 01/10/2019 12:44 PM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/10/2019. [11147880] [19-55042] (Lieberman, Jeremy) [Entered: 01/10/2019 08:23 AM]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/16/2019. Appellants David Grigsby and Joseph Shepard opening brief due 03/06/2019. Appellees Eshel Bar-Adon, BofI Holding, Inc., Gregory Garrabrants, Paul J. Grinberg and Andrew J. Micheletti answering brief due 04/08/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11147162] (RT) [Entered: 01/09/2019 02:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Grigsby, et al v. BofI Holding, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SIEBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAR MANDALEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY GARRABRANTS
Represented By: John P. Stigi III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOFI HOLDING, INC.
Represented By: John P. Stigi III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ESHEL BAR-ADON
Represented By: John P. Stigi III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL J. GRINBERG
Represented By: John P. Stigi III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW J. MICHELETTI
Represented By: John P. Stigi III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BOFI INVESTORS GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHAO WANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PHILIP RICCIARDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LINDA OSTERMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: VICKIE SIEBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LARRY L. DOOLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID GRIGSBY
Represented By: Brenda F. Szydlo
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman Esquire
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Emma Gilmore
Represented By: Jennifer Banner Sobers
Represented By: Adam M. Apton
Represented By: Adam McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH SHEPARD, On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Brenda F. Szydlo
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman Esquire
Represented By: Patrick M. Dahlstrom
Represented By: Emma Gilmore
Represented By: Jennifer Banner Sobers
Represented By: Adam M. Apton
Represented By: Adam McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?