Steamfitters Local 449 Pension v. Molina Healthcare, Inc., et al

Defendant / Appellee: JOHN C. MOLINA, J. MARIO MOLINA, MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC., RICK HOPFER and TERRY P. BAYER
Plaintiff / Appellant: STEAMFITTERS LOCAL 449 PENSION PLAN, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Case Number: 19-55050
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 25 Streamlined request [21] by Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer and Molina Healthcare, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The new requested due date is the briefs current due date. The briefing schedule remains as follows: Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer, J. Mario Molina, John C. Molina and Molina Healthcare, Inc. answering brief due 06/24/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11292498] (DJW) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:57 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY UPDATED. Streamlined request [20] by Appellees J. Mario Molina and John C. Molina to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer, J. Mario Molina, John C. Molina and Molina Healthcare, Inc. answering brief due 06/24/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11292486]--[Edited 05/09/2019 by DJW] (DJW) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:52 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 23 Added attorney James Rotstein for Rick Hopfer Terry P. Bayer Molina Healthcare, Inc.. [11292454] (RL) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:38 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Nathan Rotstein for Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer and Molina Healthcare, Inc.. Date of service: 05/09/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11292435] [19-55050] (Rotstein, James) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:31 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer and Molina Healthcare, Inc.. New requested due date is 06/24/2019. [11292422] [19-55050] (Perrin, Robert) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:24 PM]
May 9, 2019 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees J. Mario Molina and John C. Molina. New requested due date is 06/24/2019. [11292374] [19-55050] (Dwyer, John) [Entered: 05/09/2019 02:10 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 19 Filed 4 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 16 ] in 1 volume(s) filed by Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. [11278983] (SML) [Entered: 04/26/2019 02:01 PM]
April 26, 2019 Filing 18 Received 7 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 15 ] filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. [11278799] (DB) [Entered: 04/26/2019 12:43 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 15 ] submitted by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [ # 16 ] submitted by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [11276021] (SML) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:20 PM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Date of service: 04/24/2019. [11275220] [19-55050] (Goldsmith, David) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:14 AM]
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Date of service: 04/24/2019. [11275187] [19-55050] (Goldsmith, David) [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:08 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Granting Unopposed Motion [ # 13 ] to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan opening brief due 04/24/2019. Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer, J. Mario Molina, John C. Molina and Molina Healthcare, Inc. answering brief due 05/24/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11243109] (SAM) [Entered: 03/26/2019 04:14 PM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 04/24/2019. Date of service: 03/26/2019. [11242312] [19-55050] (Goldsmith, David) [Entered: 03/26/2019 10:27 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11177946] (BS) [Entered: 02/04/2019 01:18 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 02/01/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11159824] (BS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 04:26 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 Streamlined request [6] by Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan opening brief due 04/10/2019. Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer, J. Mario Molina, John C. Molina and Molina Healthcare, Inc. answering brief due 05/10/2019. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11157924] (DJW) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:21 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/17/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11157337] (AD) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:44 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/17/2019. [11157274] [19-55050] (Gardner, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/17/2019 11:57 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Added attorneys Christine M. Fox, Jonathan Gardner, David J. Goldsmith, Theodore J. Hawkins for Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. [11157000] (RL) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:53 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. New requested due date is 04/10/2019. [11156450] [19-55050] (Fox, Christine) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:52 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Theodore J. Hawkins for Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Date of service: 01/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11156438] [19-55050] (Hawkins, Theodore) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:44 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of David J. Goldsmith for Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Date of service: 01/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11156434] [19-55050] (Goldsmith, David) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:43 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Christine M. Fox for Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Date of service: 01/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11156425] [19-55050] (Fox, Christine) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:41 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan Gardner for Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan. Date of service: 01/17/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11156421] [19-55050] (Gardner, Jonathan) [Entered: 01/17/2019 07:38 AM]
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/17/2019. Appellant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Plan opening brief due 03/11/2019. Appellees Terry P. Bayer, Rick Hopfer, J. Mario Molina, John C. Molina and Molina Healthcare, Inc. answering brief due 04/09/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11148779] (JBS) [Entered: 01/10/2019 02:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steamfitters Local 449 Pension v. Molina Healthcare, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN C. MOLINA
Represented By: Shannon M. Eagan
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Lombard
Represented By: Jessie LaGoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. MARIO MOLINA
Represented By: Shannon M. Eagan
Represented By: John Charles Dwyer Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Lombard
Represented By: Jessie LaGoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOLINA HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Robert W. Perrin
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal Esquire
Represented By: James Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICK HOPFER
Represented By: Robert W. Perrin
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal Esquire
Represented By: James Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERRY P. BAYER
Represented By: Robert W. Perrin
Represented By: Manuel A. Abascal Esquire
Represented By: James Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEAMFITTERS LOCAL 449 PENSION PLAN, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Represented By: Christine M. Fox
Represented By: David J. Goldsmith
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay Esquire
Represented By: Theodore J. Hawkins
Represented By: Jonathan Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?