Brud Rossmann v. Susan Wojcicki, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LENNERT LEADER, ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE, US District Court Judge, US District Court, MIRIAM SEWELL, The District of Columbia, Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services, ANWAR GRAVES, AUSA, US Attorney's Office, SUNDAR PICHAI, CEO Alphapet, and Google, CRYSTAL LUSTIG, US Probation Office, US District Court, PATRICIA HENRICKS, ROSEMARY COLLYER, US District Court Judge, US District Court, TOYIN FASAKIN, The District of Columbia Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services, JOHN DOE, 1, 2, Sub N, LES VERMILLION, Professor, University of District of Columbia, MARK GEMBICKI, CEO, The Resilient Corporation, SUSAN WOJCICKI, CEO, You Tube, CATHY ROJKO, Trial Attorney, US Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division, SUSAN BELL, G. MICHAEL HARVEY, US Magistrate, US District Court and SERGEY IVANOV, Professor, University of District of Columbia
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRUD ROSSMANN
Case Number: 19-55359
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Filed order (DIARMUID F. O'SCANNLAIN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and PAUL J. WATFORD) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the district court has not issued any orders that are final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291. Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11275662] (OC) [Entered: 04/24/2019 01:51 PM]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Mail returned on 04/15/2019 addressed to Brud Rossmann, re: 04/01/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, no such number, unable to forward. Resending to: 4560 Macarthur Boulevard, NW, Unit 201, Washington, DC 20007. [11266381]--[Edited: address updated. 04/17/2019 by RY] (LA) [Entered: 04/16/2019 07:02 PM]
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brud Rossmann opening brief due 05/28/2019. Appellees Susan Bell, Rosemary Collyer, Toyin Fasakin, Mark Gembicki, Anwar Graves, G. Michael Harvey, Patricia Henricks, Ellen Segal Huvelle, Sergey Ivanov, John Doe, Lennert Leader, Crystal Lustig, Sundar Pichai, Cathy Rojko, Miriam Sewell, Les Vermillion and Susan Wojcicki answering brief due 06/28/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11248126] (RT) [Entered: 04/01/2019 11:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brud Rossmann v. Susan Wojcicki, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LENNERT LEADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE, US District Court Judge, US District Court
Represented By: AUSA Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIRIAM SEWELL, The District of Columbia, Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANWAR GRAVES, AUSA, US Attorney's Office
Represented By: AUSA Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNDAR PICHAI, CEO Alphapet, and Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRYSTAL LUSTIG, US Probation Office, US District Court
Represented By: AUSA Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA HENRICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSEMARY COLLYER, US District Court Judge, US District Court
Represented By: AUSA Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOYIN FASAKIN, The District of Columbia Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, 1, 2, Sub N
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LES VERMILLION, Professor, University of District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK GEMBICKI, CEO, The Resilient Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN WOJCICKI, CEO, You Tube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHY ROJKO, Trial Attorney, US Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division
Represented By: AUSA Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. MICHAEL HARVEY, US Magistrate, US District Court
Represented By: AUSA Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEY IVANOV, Professor, University of District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUD ROSSMANN
Represented By: Brud Rossmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?