Virginia Duncan, et al v. Xavier Becerra
Petitioner: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE and EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Plaintiff / Appellee: CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, INC., a California corporation, CHRISTOPHER WADDELL, PATRICK LOVETTE, RICHARD LEWIS, VIRGINIA DUNCAN and DAVID MARGUGLIO
Defendant / Appellant: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 19-55376
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [11264423] (CL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:50 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11260145] (AD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:44 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 04/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11260139] (AD) [Entered: 04/10/2019 06:44 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellees Virginia Duncan, California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Patrick Lovette, David Marguglio and Christopher Waddell Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/10/2019. [11260110] [19-55376] (Barvir, Anna) [Entered: 04/10/2019 05:34 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Xavier Becerra Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/10/2019. [11259810] [19-55376] (Echeverria, John) [Entered: 04/10/2019 03:25 PM]
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/11/2019. Transcript ordered by 05/06/2019. Transcript due 06/03/2019. Appellant Xavier Becerra opening brief due 07/15/2019. Appellees California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Virginia Duncan, Richard Lewis, Patrick Lovette, David Marguglio and Christopher Waddell answering brief due 08/15/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11253683] (RT) [Entered: 04/04/2019 04:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virginia Duncan, et al v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTOPHER WADDELL
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PATRICK LOVETTE
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RICHARD LEWIS
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VIRGINIA DUNCAN
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID MARGUGLIO
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Represented By: Alexandra Robert Gordon
Represented By: Anthony Paul O'Brien Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?