Timothy Levi v. Danny Strong, et al
Defendant / Appellee: IMAGINE ENTERTAINMENT, a Limited Liability Company, HULU-FOX HOLDINGS, a Corporation, LITTLE CHICKEN, INC., a Corporation, LEE DANIELS, an individual, FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., a Corporation, TV ONE, LLC, a Limited Liability Company and DANNY STRONG, an individual
Plaintiff / Appellant: TIMOTHY J. LEVI
Case Number: 19-55619
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees Danny Strong, Lee Daniels, Imagine Entertainment, Little Chicken, Inc., Fox Broadcasting Company, Inc., Hulu-Fox Holdings and TV One, LLC response opposing motion ([ # 5 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 07/15/2019. [11364179] [19-55619] (Kim, Elaine) [Entered: 07/15/2019 06:14 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Timothy J. Levi motion for preliminary injunction. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/02/2019. [11355550] (RR) [Entered: 07/05/2019 04:35 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Filed original and 7 copies of Appellant Timothy J. Levi (Informal: No) opening brief of 4 pages. Served on 07/01/2019. [11355476] (LA) [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:51 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 19-55619: Paid] ). Paid in district court on 06/12/2019 at entry No. 70. [11355473] (LA) [Entered: 07/05/2019 03:50 PM]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11315387] (CKP) [Entered: 05/31/2019 12:08 PM]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/28/2019. Transcript due 07/29/2019. Appellant Timothy J. Levi opening brief due 09/06/2019. Appellees Lee Daniels, Fox Broadcasting Company, Inc., Hulu-Fox Holdings, Imagine Entertainment, Little Chicken, Inc., Danny Strong and TV One, LLC answering brief due 10/07/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11313119] (JBS) [Entered: 05/30/2019 09:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy Levi v. Danny Strong, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IMAGINE ENTERTAINMENT, a Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HULU-FOX HOLDINGS, a Corporation
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LITTLE CHICKEN, INC., a Corporation
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE DANIELS, an individual
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FOX BROADCASTING COMPANY, INC., a Corporation
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TV ONE, LLC, a Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANNY STRONG, an individual
Represented By: Elaine K. Kim
Represented By: Robert H. Rotstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY J. LEVI
Represented By: Timothy J. Levi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?