Georgia Babb, et al v. CTA, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID SCHMUS, JOHN J. FRANGIAMORE, Jr., AARON HOLBROOK, ABRAM VAN DER FLUIT, as individuals, and on behalf of all others similarly situated, MICHELLE PECANIC-LEE, WILLIAM HAPP and GEORGIA BABB
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Defendant / Appellee: ERIC BANKS, PRISCILLA WINSLOW, CALIFORNIA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION, ARTHUR A. KRANTZ, in their official capacities as chairman and members of the California Public Employment Relations Board, NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, UNITED TEACHERS OF LOS ANGELES, as representative of the class of all chapters and affiliates of the California Teachers Association and ERICH SHINERS
Case Number: 19-55692
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11366516] (BS) [Entered: 07/17/2019 12:39 PM]
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 07/19/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11354929] (BS) [Entered: 07/05/2019 10:56 AM]
June 22, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11341441][19-55692] (AD) [Entered: 06/22/2019 06:44 PM]
June 22, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Georgia Babb, John J. Frangiamore, Jr., William Happ, Aaron Holbrook, Michelle Pecanic-Lee, David Schmus and Abram van der Fluit Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/22/2019. [11341404] [19-55692] (Mitchell, Jonathan) [Entered: 06/22/2019 03:57 PM]
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/25/2019. Transcript ordered by 07/18/2019. Transcript due 08/19/2019. Appellants Georgia Babb, John J. Frangiamore Jr., William Happ, Aaron Holbrook, Michelle Pecanic-Lee, David Schmus and Abram van der Fluit opening brief due 09/26/2019. Appellees Attorney General for the State of California, Eric Banks, California Teachers Association, Arthur A. Krantz, National Education Association, Erich Shiners, United Teachers of Los Angeles and Priscilla Winslow answering brief due 10/28/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11336281] (RT) [Entered: 06/18/2019 04:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Georgia Babb, et al v. CTA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SCHMUS
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN J. FRANGIAMORE, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON HOLBROOK
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ABRAM VAN DER FLUIT, as individuals, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHELLE PECANIC-LEE
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM HAPP
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGIA BABB
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Talcott J. Franklin
Represented By: Christopher Hellmich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Lara Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC BANKS
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRISCILLA WINSLOW
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARTHUR A. KRANTZ, in their official capacities as chairman and members of the California Public Employment Relations Board
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED TEACHERS OF LOS ANGELES, as representative of the class of all chapters and affiliates of the California Teachers Association
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Demain Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERICH SHINERS
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?