Justin Shekoski v. Bert McCracken, et al
Defendant: SEAN AKHAVAN, an individual and THE USED, LLC, a Utah limited liability company
Defendant / Appellant: BERT MCCRACKEN, an individual, JEPH HOWARD, an individual and DAN WHITESIDES, an individual
Plaintiff / Appellee: JUSTIN SHEKOSKI, an individual
Case Number: 19-55710
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/27/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 08/09/2019 ). [11392703] (MS) [Entered: 08/09/2019 01:13 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Attorneys Edwin F. McPherson, Edwin F. McPherson and Edwin F. McPherson in 19-55710 substituted by Attorneys William M. Paoli, William M. Paoli and William M. Paoli in 19-55710 [11391507] (CW) [Entered: 08/08/2019 02:18 PM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William Michael Paoli (Paoli & Purdy, P.C., 4340 Von Karman Ave., Suite 100, Newport Beach, CA 92660, 949-752-7711) for Appellants Jeph Howard, Bert McCracken and Dan Whitesides. Substitution for Attorney Edwin F. McPherson, Esquire for Appellants Jeph Howard, Bert McCracken and Dan Whitesides. Date of service: 08/08/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11391477] [19-55710] (Paoli, William) [Entered: 08/08/2019 02:03 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/09/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11371712] (BS) [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:44 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/19/2019, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11352197] (BS) [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:09 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Justin Shekoski Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/27/2019. [11347620] [19-55710] (Oines, Ronald) [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:19 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/27/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11346955][19-55710] (AD) [Entered: 06/27/2019 12:44 PM]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Jeph Howard, Bert McCracken and Dan Whitesides Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/27/2019. [11346857] [19-55710] (McPherson, Edwin) [Entered: 06/27/2019 11:43 AM]
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/27/2019. Appellants Jeph Howard, Bert McCracken and Dan Whitesides opening brief due 08/19/2019. Appellee Justin Shekoski answering brief due 09/19/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11339680] (RT) [Entered: 06/20/2019 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justin Shekoski v. Bert McCracken, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BERT MCCRACKEN, an individual
Represented By: Edwin F. McPherson Esquire
Represented By: William M. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JEPH HOWARD, an individual
Represented By: Edwin F. McPherson Esquire
Represented By: William M. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAN WHITESIDES, an individual
Represented By: Edwin F. McPherson Esquire
Represented By: William M. Paoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN AKHAVAN, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE USED, LLC, a Utah limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUSTIN SHEKOSKI, an individual
Represented By: Ronald Paul Oines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?