Alfred Johnson v. Winco Foods, LLC, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WINCO FOODS, LLC, a Delaware limted liability company and WINCO HOLDINGS, INC., an Idaho corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALFRED JOHNSON, individually and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated
Case Number: 19-55716
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Liana Carter in 19-55716 substituted by Attorney John Ely Stobart in 19-55716 [11375424] (CW) [Entered: 07/24/2019 02:29 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Ely Stobart (Capstone Law APC, 1875 Century Park East, Suite 1000, Los Angeles, CA 90067) for Appellant Alfred Johnson. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Liana Carter, Esquire for Appellant Alfred Johnson. Date of service: 07/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11375129] [19-55716] (Stobart, John) [Entered: 07/24/2019 11:53 AM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 07/26/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11361973] (CL) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:35 PM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LCC): The courts records reflect that the notice of appeal was filed during the pendency of a timely-filed motion listed in Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4(a)(4), and that motion is still pending in the district court. The June 20, 2019 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending June 18, 2019 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. [11357683] (TSP) [Entered: 07/09/2019 10:22 AM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/28/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11349432][19-55716] (AD) [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:44 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/28/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11349430][19-55716] (AD) [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:44 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Alfred Johnson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/28/2019. [11349139] [19-55716] (Wu, Ryan) [Entered: 06/28/2019 04:04 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellees Winco Foods, LLC and Winco Holdings, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/28/2019. [11349073] [19-55716] (Launey, Kristina) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:35 PM]
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/28/2019. Transcript ordered by 07/22/2019. Transcript due 08/19/2019. Appellant Alfred Johnson opening brief due 09/30/2019. Appellees Winco Foods, LLC and Winco Holdings, Inc. answering brief due 10/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11340282] (RT) [Entered: 06/21/2019 10:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Alfred Johnson v. Winco Foods, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINCO FOODS, LLC, a Delaware limted liability company
Represented By: Simon Lee Yang Esquire
Represented By: Kristina M. Launey Esquire
Represented By: Julie G. Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WINCO HOLDINGS, INC., an Idaho corporation
Represented By: Simon Lee Yang Esquire
Represented By: Kristina M. Launey Esquire
Represented By: Julie G. Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALFRED JOHNSON, individually and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated
Represented By: Liana Carter Esquire
Represented By: Robert Drexler Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Wu Esquire
Represented By: John Ely Stobart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?