Brud Rossmann v. Susan Wojcicki, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LENNERT LEADER, ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE, US District Court Judge, US District Court, MIRIAM SEWELL, The District of Columbia, Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services, ANWAR GRAVES, AUSA, US Attorney's Office, SUNDAR PICHAI, CEO Alphapet, and Google, CRYSTAL LUSTIG, US Probation Office, US District Court, PATRICIA HENRICKS, ROSEMARY COLLYER, US District Court Judge, US District Court, TOYIN FASAKIN, The District of Columbia Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services, JOHN DOE, 1, 2, Sub N, LES VERMILLION, Professor, University of District of Columbia, MARK GEMBICKI, CEO, The Resilient Corporation, SUSAN WOJCICKI, CEO, You Tube, CATHY ROJKO, Trial Attorney, US Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division, SUSAN BELL, G. MICHAEL HARVEY, US Magistrate, US District Court and SERGEY IVANOV, Professor, University of District of Columbia
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRUD ROSSMANN
Case Number: 19-55731
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]) is denied because the motion requests dismissal without prejudice. If appellant seeks voluntary dismissal of this appeal, the motion must request dismissal with prejudice. Within 14 days of this order, appellant may file a renewed motion for voluntary dismissal requesting dismissal with prejudice. If a renewed motion is not filed, appellant remains obligated to comply with the July 1, 2019 order. [11405906]--[Edited: docket text updated to include link to 08/05/2019 motion in entry [ # 3 ]. 08/21/2019 by RY] (CKP) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:47 PM]
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Brud Rossmann letter dated 08/12/2019 re: Page substitute of previous motion. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11404630] (NAC) [Entered: 08/21/2019 08:20 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Brud Rossmann motion to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Deficiencies: None. Served on. [11388538] (RR) [Entered: 08/06/2019 11:26 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court denied appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis because it found that the action was frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11350250] (CKP) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:24 AM]
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Brud Rossmann opening brief due 08/23/2019. [11344011] (RT) [Entered: 06/25/2019 02:07 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brud Rossmann v. Susan Wojcicki, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LENNERT LEADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ELLEN SEGAL HUVELLE, US District Court Judge, US District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIRIAM SEWELL, The District of Columbia, Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANWAR GRAVES, AUSA, US Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUNDAR PICHAI, CEO Alphapet, and Google
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CRYSTAL LUSTIG, US Probation Office, US District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA HENRICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROSEMARY COLLYER, US District Court Judge, US District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOYIN FASAKIN, The District of Columbia Rehabilitation Services Agency, Department of Disability Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE, 1, 2, Sub N
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LES VERMILLION, Professor, University of District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK GEMBICKI, CEO, The Resilient Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN WOJCICKI, CEO, You Tube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATHY ROJKO, Trial Attorney, US Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUSAN BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G. MICHAEL HARVEY, US Magistrate, US District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SERGEY IVANOV, Professor, University of District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRUD ROSSMANN
Represented By: Brud Rossmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?