Paul Blumberg, et al v. Brian Hewitt, et al
Plaintiff: GRACIELA MORENO
Defendant: SAM MARTIN and DOE, Defendants, 1 through 10, inclusive
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAUL BLUMBERG
Defendant / Appellee: BRAD FOSS, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES and BRIAN HEWITT
Case Number: 19-55792
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Geoffrey Plowden in 19-55792 substituted by Attorney Matthew Alex Scherb in 19-55792 [11375329] (NAC) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:56 PM]
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Matthew A. Scherb (Los Angeles City Attorney's Office) for Appellee City of Los Angeles. Substitution for Attorney Mr. Geoffrey Plowden for Appellee City of Los Angeles. Date of service: 07/24/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11375323] [19-55792] (Scherb, Matthew) [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:53 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/17/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11367254][19-55792] (AD) [Entered: 07/17/2019 06:44 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellees County of Los Angeles and Brad Foss Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/17/2019. [11366949] [19-55792] (Allen, Michael) [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:26 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Arnoldo Casillas for Appellant Paul Blumberg. Party proceeding without counsel: Yes, mailing address provided. Party mailing address: 19326 Stillmore Street, Apt. 142; Canyon Country, CA 91351; (213) 399-0032; paul.blumberg78@gmail.com. Date of service: 07/11/2019. [11361256] [19-55792] (Casillas, Arnoldo) [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:45 PM]
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/17/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/09/2019. Transcript due 09/09/2019. Appellant Paul Blumberg opening brief due 10/18/2019. Appellees City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, Brad Foss and Brian Hewitt answering brief due 11/18/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11359247] (JMR) [Entered: 07/10/2019 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Blumberg, et al v. Brian Hewitt, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL BLUMBERG
Represented By: Arnoldo Casillas
Represented By: Paul Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE, Defendants, 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD FOSS
Represented By: Michael Allen
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Geoffrey Plowden
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Michael Allen
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRIAN HEWITT
Represented By: Deborah J. Fox Esquire
Represented By: David Mehretu Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRACIELA MORENO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?