Daniella Auningputri, et al v. USDOJ, et al
Plaintiff: KRISTINA LIMBONG, ALEX LONDA, ELDRIDGE WOY, JEREMIAH MICHAEL PROBODANU, LORA LONDA, ANNEKE PALAR, FERDINANDUS HUDI SANTOSA and ECHGLENE WOY
Defendant / Appellee: THOMAS D. HOMAN, in his official capacity as the Senior Official Performing the duties of the Director of ICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, THOMAS P. GILES, in his official capacity as the Deputy Field Office Director of Detention and Removal Operation for District 23, DAVID A. MARIN, in his official capacity as the Director of the Los Angeles Field Office of ICE and UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALBERT PALAR, individually and on behalf of all similarly situated individuals, ADELENA PALAR and DANIELLA AUNINGPUTRI
Case Number: 19-55869
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The dial-in assessment conference previously scheduled for September 25, 2019, is taken off calendar. This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11410119] (BLS) [Entered: 08/26/2019 11:57 AM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 09/25/2019, 11:30 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11405633] (MS) [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:23 PM]
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 08/20/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11389046] (BLS) [Entered: 08/06/2019 03:16 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/05/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11387910][19-55869] (AD) [Entered: 08/05/2019 06:44 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Daniella Auningputri Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/05/2019. [11387361] [19-55869] (Glazer, Nicolette) [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:28 PM]
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/05/2019. Transcript ordered by 08/27/2019. Transcript due 09/26/2019. Appellants Daniella Auningputri, Adelena Palar and Albert Palar opening brief due 11/05/2019. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Thomas P. Giles, Thomas D. Homan, David A. Marin, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and United States Department of Justice answering brief due 12/05/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11379494] (RT) [Entered: 07/29/2019 12:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniella Auningputri, et al v. USDOJ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTINA LIMBONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEX LONDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELDRIDGE WOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMIAH MICHAEL PROBODANU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORA LONDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNEKE PALAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FERDINANDUS HUDI SANTOSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ECHGLENE WOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS D. HOMAN, in his official capacity as the Senior Official Performing the duties of the Director of ICE
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS P. GILES, in his official capacity as the Deputy Field Office Director of Detention and Removal Operation for District 23
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID A. MARIN, in his official capacity as the Director of the Los Angeles Field Office of ICE
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Papu Sandhu
Represented By: Steven Kiyoto Uejio Esquire
Represented By: Victor Matthew Lawrence Esquire I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALBERT PALAR, individually and on behalf of all similarly situated individuals
Represented By: Nicolette Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADELENA PALAR
Represented By: Nicolette Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIELLA AUNINGPUTRI
Represented By: Nicolette Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?