David Whitehead v. Netflix, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, Unnamed Random House Publisher; Unnamed Colony Capital; Unnamed Dewayne Wickham; Unnamed Tyler Perry; Unnamed Tom Cruise and Paula Wagner; John Does 1-15 et al., JOHN DOES, 1-10, LIONSGATE HOME ENTERTAINMENT, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., PARAMOUNT PICTURES, INC., VIACOM, COMCAST, CBS, INC., AMAZON STUDIO, SONY HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC., BANK OF AMERICA, MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT LLC, NETFLIX, INC., AMAZON BOOKS, BUENA VISTA HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC., WALT DISNEY COMPANY, JP MORGAN, MGM, INC., MARVEL STUDIOS LLC and CIRQUE DU SOLEIL
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID LOUIS WHITEHEAD
Case Number: 19-55905
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant David Louis Whitehead's supplemental brief (titled "supplemental or amended opening brief") (Informal: No) of 23 pages. Served on 09/26/2019. Major deficiencies: motion required. Notified appellant. [11447162] (LA) [Entered: 09/27/2019 04:22 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Filed Appellant David Louis Whitehead motion for injunction pending appeal. Deficiencies: None. Served on 09/20/2019. [11442737] (CW) [Entered: 09/25/2019 07:03 AM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant David Louis Whitehead (Informal: No) opening brief of 26 pages (titled as "notice of appeal"). Served on 08/16/2019. [11436266] (LA) [Entered: 09/18/2019 03:19 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 12 Filed order (JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and ANDREW D. HURWITZ): The motion to stay this appeal is denied as moot (Docket Entry No. [ # 3 ]). All relief requested in the motions at Docket Entry Nos. [ # 4 ] and [ # 5 ] is denied. The Clerk shall file the opening brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 9 ]). The answering brief remains due October 28, 2019. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11434233] (AF) [Entered: 09/17/2019 11:54 AM]
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed 8/29/19. [11421473] (CW) [Entered: 09/05/2019 07:50 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Sent copy of docket report to appellant. [11413208] (LA) [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:20 AM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 08/22/2019. [11406368] (BY) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:18 AM]
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Sent dockket report to Appellant per his request.. [11405324] (GV) [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:16 PM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant David Louis Whitehead opening brief (Informal: No) of 26 pages (titled as "notice of appeal"). Served on 08/16/2019. Major deficiencies: motion to stay appellate proceedings is pending. [11413174] (LA) [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:10 AM]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Petitioner David Louis Whitehead in 19-71906 letter dated 08/16/2019 re: "Notice of appeal", misc docs attached. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11404583] [19-55905, 19-71906]--[Edited 08/28/2019 by LA to treat document as a letter only in 19-71906; document is construed as opening brief in 19-55905 at docket entry [ # 9 ].] (CW) [Entered: 08/21/2019 07:40 AM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant David Louis Whitehead motion to stay and request for an extension. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/12/2019. [11400309] (JFF) [Entered: 08/16/2019 02:03 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Filed Appellant David Louis Whitehead EMERGENCY motion for the court to correct caption. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/12/2019. [11400191] (JFF) [Entered: 08/16/2019 01:18 PM]
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant David Louis Whitehead motion to stay. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/12/2019. [11399956] (JFF) [Entered: 08/16/2019 11:52 AM]
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11390951] (CKP) [Entered: 08/08/2019 10:20 AM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant David Louis Whitehead opening brief due 09/27/2019. Appellees Amazon Books, Amazon Studio, Bank of America, Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc., CBS, Inc., Cirque du Soleil, Comcast, Does, John Does, JP Morgan, Lionsgate Home Entertainment, MGM, Inc., Marvel Entertainment LLC, Marvel Studios LLC, Netflix, Inc., Paramount Pictures, Inc., Sony Home Entertainment, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Viacom and Walt Disney Company answering brief due 10/28/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11386524] (JBS) [Entered: 08/05/2019 09:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Whitehead v. Netflix, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, Unnamed Random House Publisher; Unnamed Colony Capital; Unnamed Dewayne Wickham; Unnamed Tyler Perry; Unnamed Tom Cruise and Paula Wagner; John Does 1-15 et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIONSGATE HOME ENTERTAINMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARAMOUNT PICTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VIACOM
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMCAST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CBS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON STUDIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SONY HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARVEL ENTERTAINMENT LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NETFLIX, INC.
Represented By: Emily Fenner Evitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMAZON BOOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUENA VISTA HOME ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALT DISNEY COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JP MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MGM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARVEL STUDIOS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CIRQUE DU SOLEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID LOUIS WHITEHEAD
Represented By: David Louis Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?