Flordeliza Hawkins v. California Health and Human Se, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JAIME PENA, Social Worker for Medical and (illegible) Benefits, official and individual capacity, CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, Ventura County, ANGELICA FARLEY, Social Worker for In Home Support Services, official and individual capacity, COUNTY OF VENTURA and ROBERT PAREDES, Administrative Specialist, official and individual capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: FLORDELIZA A. HAWKINS
Case Number: 19-55928
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Filed Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins letter dated 09/25/2019 re: how does the order filed 9/17/19 affect my legal claim. Paper filing deficiency: None. [11451704] (RR) [Entered: 10/02/2019 02:03 PM]
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Filed order (KIM MCLANE WARDLAW, JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and ANDREW D. HURWITZ) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the July 29, 2019 notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after the district courts judgment entered on January 31, 2019, or the post-judgment orders entered on March 1, 2019, May 2, 2019, and June 13, 2019. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [11433770] (WL) [Entered: 09/17/2019 09:44 AM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Received original and 6 copies of Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins supplemental brief (Informal: Yes) 2 pages. Served on 09/10/2019. Major deficiencies: case closed. [11437731] (KT) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:16 PM]
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins motion to file supplemental brief. Deficiencies: Case closed. Served on 09/09/2019. [11437723] (KT) [Entered: 09/19/2019 03:14 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/20/2019. [11415611] (RR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:44 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis with CJA form 23. Deficiencies: No proof of service. [11415591] (RR) [Entered: 08/29/2019 02:37 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Received original and 6 copies of Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins opening brief (Informal: Yes) 8 pages. Served on 08/20/2019. Major deficiencies: IFP motion pending. [11412136] (KT) [Entered: 08/27/2019 02:15 PM]
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court order filed on 08/15/2019. Denying motion to proceed IFP on appeal. [11400767] (RR) [Entered: 08/16/2019 04:13 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Filed Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/26/2019. [11390442] (JPD) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:00 PM]
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Flordeliza A. Hawkins opening brief due 09/27/2019. Appellees California Health and Human Services, County of Ventura, Angelica Farley, Robert Paredes and Jaime Pena answering brief due 10/28/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11390449] (JPD) [Entered: 08/07/2019 04:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Flordeliza Hawkins v. California Health and Human Se, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAIME PENA, Social Worker for Medical and (illegible) Benefits, official and individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, Ventura County
Represented By: John Polich
Represented By: John E. Polich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELICA FARLEY, Social Worker for In Home Support Services, official and individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF VENTURA
Represented By: John Polich
Represented By: John E. Polich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT PAREDES, Administrative Specialist, official and individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FLORDELIZA A. HAWKINS
Represented By: Flordeliza A. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?