Steven Rupp, et al v. Xavier Becerra
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHRISTOPHER SEIFERT, MICHAEL JONES, CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, INC., DENNIS MARTIN, TROY WILLIS, STEVEN DEMBER, ALFONSO VALENCIA, STEVEN RUPP and CHERYL JOHNSON
Defendant / Appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 19-56004
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Added Attorney(s) Marc A. Nardone for party(s) Appellant Troy Willis Appellant Steven Dember Appellant California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. Appellant Dennis Martin Appellant Alfonso Valencia Appellant Steven Rupp Appellant Christopher Seifert Appellant Cheryl Johnson Appellant Michael Jones, in case 19-56004. [11472395] (CW) [Entered: 10/22/2019 08:43 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marc Alexander Nardone (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350, Washington, DC 20036) for Appellants California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia and Troy Willis. Date of service: 10/22/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11472325] [19-56004] (Nardone, Marc) [Entered: 10/22/2019 07:30 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 Added Attorney(s) Candice Leigh Rucker for party(s) Appellant Troy Willis Appellant Steven Dember Appellant California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. Appellant Dennis Martin Appellant Alfonso Valencia Appellant Steven Rupp Appellant Christopher Seifert Appellant Cheryl Johnson Appellant Michael Jones, in case 19-56004. [11472320] (CW) [Entered: 10/22/2019 07:27 AM]
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Candice Leigh Rucker (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350, Washington, DC 20036) for Appellants California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia and Troy Willis. Date of service: 10/22/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11472306] [19-56004] (Rucker, Candice) [Entered: 10/22/2019 07:11 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Filed order MEDIATION (BLS): The courts order (Docket Entry No. [ # 10 ]) was issued in error and is vacated. [11445368] (AF) [Entered: 09/26/2019 04:09 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 10/10/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11445161] (BLS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:49 PM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11445148] (BLS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:46 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) James Wallace Porter III for party(s) Appellant Troy Willis Appellant Steven Dember Appellant California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. Appellant Dennis Martin Appellant Alfonso Valencia Appellant Steven Rupp Appellant Christopher Seifert Appellant Cheryl Johnson Appellant Michael Jones, in case 19-56004. [11437321] (CW) [Entered: 09/19/2019 01:09 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James Wallace Porter III (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue N, Birmingham, AL 35203) for Appellants California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia and Troy Willis. Date of service: 09/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11437217] [19-56004] (Porter, James) [Entered: 09/19/2019 12:12 PM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) John Parker Sweeney for party(s) Appellant Troy Willis Appellant Steven Dember Appellant California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc. Appellant Dennis Martin Appellant Alfonso Valencia Appellant Steven Rupp Appellant Christopher Seifert Appellant Cheryl Johnson Appellant Michael Jones, in case 19-56004. [11437003] (CW) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:39 AM]
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John Parker Sweeney (Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP, 1615 L Street NW, Suite 1350, Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellants California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia and Troy Willis. Date of service: 09/19/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11436953] [19-56004] (Sweeney, John) [Entered: 09/19/2019 10:19 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 09/25/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11428524] (BLS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:28 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/04/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11421382][19-56004] (AD) [Entered: 09/04/2019 06:44 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia and Troy Willis Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/04/2019. [11421271] [19-56004] (Brady, Sean) [Entered: 09/04/2019 04:28 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/04/2019. Transcript ordered by 09/26/2019. Transcript due 10/28/2019. Appellants California Rifle & Pistol Association, Inc., Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia and Troy Willis opening brief due 12/05/2019. Appellee Xavier Becerra answering brief due 01/06/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11413225] (JBS) [Entered: 08/28/2019 10:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Rupp, et al v. Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER SEIFERT
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL JONES
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALIFORNIA RIFLE & PISTOL ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS MARTIN
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TROY WILLIS
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN DEMBER
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALFONSO VALENCIA
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN RUPP
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHERYL JOHNSON
Represented By: Sean Anthony Brady
Represented By: Anna Barvir
Represented By: Carl D. Michel Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Represented By: Peter H. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?