Thomas Heilman v. D. McAlister, et al
Defendant / Appellee: R. OCHOA, Appeals Coordinator (CC-II), individual/official capacity, MELANIE MILLER, Superior Court Clerk, individual/official capacity, R. W. TOMPKINS, individual, CHARLES S. CRANDALL, Superior Court Judge, official capacity only, R. L. FURSTER, individual/official capacity, J. GASTELO, individual, XAVIER BECERRA, Calif. State Attorney General, official capacity only, P. DENNY, individual/official capacity, R. NICHOLSON, Counselor, CC-I, individual, MORGAN WILLIAMS, Counselor's Supervisor, CC-II, D. H. MCALISTER, individual, R. MOORE, individual, CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION, KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, official capacity, T. LANSFORD, Counselor's Supervisor, CC-II, individual, J. JAVAUX, individual/official capacity, CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE, SAN LUIS OBISPO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT and M. POWELL, Superior Court Clerk, individual/official capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS JOHN HEILMAN
Case Number: 19-56123
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Filed original and 1 copy of Appellant Thomas John Heilman (Informal: Yes) opening brief of 49 pages. Served on 10/27/2019. [11509839] (LA) [Entered: 11/22/2019 05:13 PM]
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Filed order (JAY S. BYBEE and SANDRA S. IKUTA) Appellants motion for appointment of counsel (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is denied. No motions for reconsideration, clarification, or modification of this denial shall be filed or entertained. The Clerk shall file the opening brief received on October 29, 2019. Because there is no appearance by appellees, briefing is complete. [11508405] (WL) [Entered: 11/22/2019 09:18 AM]
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Received original and 1 copy of Appellant Thomas John Heilman's opening brief (Informal: Yes) of 49 pages. Served on 10/27/2019. Major deficiencies: briefing stayed (motion for appointment of counsel is pending). [11482031] (LA) [Entered: 10/29/2019 02:36 PM]
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Thomas John Heilman motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [11475251] (RR) [Entered: 10/23/2019 03:40 PM]
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/17/2019. [11467521] (BY) [Entered: 10/17/2019 09:17 AM]
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): Appellants October 2, 2019 motion for an extension of time [ # 3 ] in which to comply with this courts September 24, 2019 order is granted. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, accompanied by a completed Form 4 financial affidavit, or shall pay the $505 filing and docketing fees to the district court. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. [11459445] (CKP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 01:21 PM]
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Thomas John Heilman motion to extend time to comply with the order dated 09/24/2029. Deficiencies: None. [11452946] (RR) [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:08 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11441713] (CKP) [Entered: 09/24/2019 01:00 PM]
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Thomas John Heilman opening brief due 11/15/2019. [11441208] (JBS) [Entered: 09/24/2019 10:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas Heilman v. D. McAlister, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. OCHOA, Appeals Coordinator (CC-II), individual/official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MELANIE MILLER, Superior Court Clerk, individual/official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. W. TOMPKINS, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES S. CRANDALL, Superior Court Judge, official capacity only
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. L. FURSTER, individual/official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. GASTELO, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: XAVIER BECERRA, Calif. State Attorney General, official capacity only
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: P. DENNY, individual/official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. NICHOLSON, Counselor, CC-I, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORGAN WILLIAMS, Counselor's Supervisor, CC-II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. H. MCALISTER, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. MOORE, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. LANSFORD, Counselor's Supervisor, CC-II, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. JAVAUX, individual/official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAN LUIS OBISPO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. POWELL, Superior Court Clerk, individual/official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS JOHN HEILMAN
Represented By: Thomas John Heilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?