Breanna Walker, et al v. City of Riverside, et al
Plaintiff: A. M., Guardian Ad Litem Marla Miles, A. R., Guardian Ad Litem Marla Miles, MARLA MILES, Guardian Ad Litem for A.M., A.R., A.M., & A.B., N. W., Guardian Ad Litem Breanna Walker, RUSSELL WILKERSON and A. B., Guardian Ad Litem Marla Miles
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, 1 to 10, ROWE`, Det. 605, CITY OF RIVERSIDE, JIM SIMONS, CHARETTE, Sgt., RIVERSIDE POLICE DEPARTMENT, DAVID R. REEVES, Officer, SMITH, Det. 444, J. D. FLOYD, Officer, RUSS LEACH, Chief of Police, SUTTON, RPD Ofc and KENDALL BANKS, Sgt.
Plaintiff / Appellant: BREANNA WALKER, Guardian Ad Litem for N.W.
Case Number: 19-56175
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference w/ counsel for appellee only, 12/02/2019, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [11496436] (BLS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 03:21 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/07/2019, 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 11/01/2019 ). [11485180] (BLS) [Entered: 10/31/2019 02:48 PM]
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 10/29/2019. [11482644] (BY) [Entered: 10/30/2019 08:11 AM]
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 11/01/2019, 3:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11478614] (BLS) [Entered: 10/25/2019 03:05 PM]
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11469323] (TSP) [Entered: 10/18/2019 09:58 AM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Terminated Timothy T, Coates for Sutton, Smith, Jim Simons, Rowe`, Riverside Police Department, J. D. Floyd, City of Riverside, Charette and Kendall Banks in 19-56175, Alana Rotter for Sutton, Smith, Jim Simons, Rowe`, Riverside Police Department, J. D. Floyd, City of Riverside, Charette and Kendall Banks in 19-56175 [11465530] (QDL) [Entered: 10/16/2019 09:42 AM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/11/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11462849][19-56175] (AD) [Entered: 10/11/2019 06:44 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Alana Rotter for Appellees Kendall Banks, Charette, City of Riverside, J. D. Floyd, Riverside Police Department, Rowe`, Jim Simons, Smith and Sutton and Mr. Timothy T, Coates for Appellees Kendall Banks, Charette, City of Riverside, J. D. Floyd, Riverside Police Department, Rowe`, Jim Simons, Smith and Sutton. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 10/11/2019. [11462719] [19-56175] (Rotter, Alana) [Entered: 10/11/2019 04:34 PM]
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Breanna Walker Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/11/2019. [11462450] [19-56175]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filer. 10/11/2019 by QDL] (Harper, Caree) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:18 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11460702][19-56175] (AD) [Entered: 10/10/2019 12:44 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellees Kendall Banks, Charette, City of Riverside, J. D. Floyd, Russ Leach, David R. Reeves, Riverside Police Department, Rowe`, Jim Simons, Smith and Sutton Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/10/2019. [11460241] [19-56175] (Okazaki, Neil) [Entered: 10/10/2019 08:46 AM]
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/15/2019. Transcript ordered by 11/04/2019. Transcript due 12/02/2019. Appellant Breanna Walker opening brief due 01/13/2020. Appellees Kendall Banks, Charette, City of Riverside, Does, J. D. Floyd, Russ Leach, David R. Reeves, Riverside Police Department, Rowe`, Jim Simons, Smith and Sutton answering brief due 02/10/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11455703] (JBS) [Entered: 10/07/2019 09:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breanna Walker, et al v. City of Riverside, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROWE`, Det. 605
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF RIVERSIDE
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM SIMONS
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARETTE, Sgt.
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RIVERSIDE POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID R. REEVES, Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SMITH, Det. 444
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. D. FLOYD, Officer
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RUSS LEACH, Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUTTON, RPD Ofc
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENDALL BANKS, Sgt.
Represented By: Timothy T, Coates
Represented By: Alana Rotter
Represented By: James E. Brown
Represented By: John M. Porter Esquire
Represented By: Neil D. Okazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M., Guardian Ad Litem Marla Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. R., Guardian Ad Litem Marla Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARLA MILES, Guardian Ad Litem for A.M., A.R., A.M., & A.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. W., Guardian Ad Litem Breanna Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUSSELL WILKERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. B., Guardian Ad Litem Marla Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BREANNA WALKER, Guardian Ad Litem for N.W.
Represented By: Caree Annette Harper Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?