Estate of William D. Pilgrim, et al v. General Motors LLC, et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM D. PILGRIM
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 10, inclusive and GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: ALAN FERRER, MARC ADAMS, DEVRY DAVIS, ALAN PELLETIER, HOWARD KOPEL, ADAM BALDUCCI, MIKE PETERS, ANTHONY STACK, ROGER L. BROWNING, AARON CLARK, DAVID WARD, JAMES OSHEIM, KALEB ISLEY, LYLE BARKLEY, ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. PILGRIM, JOHN PENDLETON, RANDY STANDKE, CHRISTOPHER MARTIN CONSTANTINE, ROBERT L. BRIGGS, ROBERT C. MURPHY, FRANK L. JUZSWIK, JEFFREY M. MILLSLAGLE, SHAWN BAIN, JOHN PARSONS, JARED KILEY, MORRIS SMITH, TUAN BUI, KAI QIAN, JEFF KOLODZI, JOHN LEBAR, CHAD REESE, MARK ROWE, EDWIN ROJAS, DENNIS PALMQUIST, MATHEW EVANS, RICHARD JENKINS, ROBERT GEISS, BRADLEY GRANT, DEREK VAN DEN TOP, DAVID PENROD, ROBERT EDGAR, JACK WOODALL, DALLAS WICKER, JEROME E. PEDERSON, MIGUEL QUEZADA, EDWIN WILLIAM KRAUSE, ROY HALEEN, BENJAMIN LUKE, AHMED J. CANNON, WILLIAM CHURCH, MICHAEL FERNANDEZ, S. GARRETT BECK, DAVID SHELDON, LYLE DUNAHOO, ANDRES FREY, individuals, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, JAN ENGWIS and WALTER GOETZMAN
Defendant / Appellee: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 19-56254
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: SM) Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted. This appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. [11535493] (OC) [Entered: 12/17/2019 01:41 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants Shawn Bain, Adam Balducci, S. Garrett Beck, Robert L. Briggs, Roger L. Browning, Tuan Bui, Ahmed J. Cannon, William Church, Aaron Clark, Christopher Martin Constantine, Devry Davis, Lyle Dunahoo, Robert Edgar, Jan Engwis, Estate of William D. Pilgrim, Mathew Evans, Alan Ferrer, Andres Frey, Robert Geiss, Walter Goetzman, Bradley Grant, Richard Jenkins, Frank L. Juzswik, Jared Kiley, Jeff Kolodzi, Edwin William Krause, John Lebar, Jeffrey M. Millslagle, James Osheim, John Parsons, Jerome E. Pederson, Alan Pelletier, David Penrod, Chad Reese, Edwin Rojas, David Sheldon, Morris Smith, Derek Van Den Top, David Ward and Jack Woodall Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 12/06/2019. [11523872] [19-56254] (Jardini, Andre) [Entered: 12/06/2019 12:28 PM]
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): Appellants motion for voluntary dismissal (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]) is denied because the motion requests dismissal without prejudice. If appellants seek voluntary dismissal of this appeal, the motion must request dismissal with prejudice. Within 14 days of this order, appellants may file a renewed motion for voluntary dismissal requesting dismissal with prejudice, or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellants do not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court [11513698] (OC) [Entered: 11/26/2019 03:19 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marc Adams, Shawn Bain, Adam Balducci, Lyle Barkley, S. Garrett Beck, Robert L. Briggs, Roger L. Browning, Tuan Bui, Ahmed J. Cannon, William Church, Aaron Clark, Christopher Martin Constantine, Devry Davis, Lyle Dunahoo, Robert Edgar, Jan Engwis, Estate of William D. Pilgrim, Mathew Evans, Michael Fernandez, Alan Ferrer, Andres Frey, Robert Geiss, Walter Goetzman, Bradley Grant, Roy Haleen, Kaleb Isley, Richard Jenkins, Frank L. Juzswik, Jared Kiley, Jeff Kolodzi, Howard Kopel, Edwin William Krause, John Lebar, Benjamin Luke, Jeffrey M. Millslagle, Robert C. Murphy, James Osheim, Dennis Palmquist, John Parsons, Jerome E. Pederson, Alan Pelletier, John Pendleton, David Penrod, Mike Peters, Kai Qian, Miguel Quezada, Chad Reese, Edwin Rojas, Mark Rowe, David Sheldon, Morris Smith, Anthony Stack, Randy Standke, Derek Van Den Top, David Ward, Dallas Wicker and Jack Woodall Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 11/21/2019. [11507294]--[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [3].] (SLM) [Entered: 11/21/2019 01:19 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 4 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellants Shawn Bain, Adam Balducci, S. Garrett Beck, Robert L. Briggs, Tuan Bui, Ahmed J. Cannon, William Church, Aaron Clark, Christopher Martin Constantine, Devry Davis, Lyle Dunahoo, Robert Edgar, Jan Engwis, Estate of William D. Pilgrim, Mathew Evans, Alan Ferrer, Andres Frey, Robert Geiss, Walter Goetzman, Bradley Grant, Richard Jenkins, Frank L. Juzswik, Jared Kiley, Jeff Kolodzi, Edwin William Krause, John Lebar, Jeffrey M. Millslagle, James Osheim, John Parsons, Jerome E. Pederson, Alan Pelletier, David Penrod, Chad Reese, Edwin Rojas, David Sheldon, Morris Smith, Derek Van Den Top, David Ward, Jack Woodall and Roger L. Browning response to Court order dated 10/31/2019. Date of service: 11/21/2019. [11507199] [19-56254] (Jardini, Andre) [Entered: 11/21/2019 12:35 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CJ): It appears that the district courts order challenged in this appeal may not have disposed of the action as to all claims and all parties. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellants shall move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221 (9th Cir. 1981) (order is not appealable unless it disposes of all claims as to all parties or judgment is entered in compliance with rule). If appellants elect to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellants do not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [11485316] (OC) [Entered: 10/31/2019 03:46 PM]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Estate of William D. Pilgrim et al Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/07/2019. Appellants Estate of William D. Pilgrim et al opening brief due 12/30/2019. Appellee General Motors LLC answering brief due 01/28/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11484568] (HC) [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of William D. Pilgrim, et al v. General Motors LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN FERRER
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARC ADAMS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEVRY DAVIS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN PELLETIER
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HOWARD KOPEL
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADAM BALDUCCI
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKE PETERS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY STACK
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER L. BROWNING
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AARON CLARK
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID WARD
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES OSHEIM
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KALEB ISLEY
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYLE BARKLEY
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. PILGRIM
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN PENDLETON
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RANDY STANDKE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER MARTIN CONSTANTINE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT L. BRIGGS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT C. MURPHY
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANK L. JUZSWIK
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY M. MILLSLAGLE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHAWN BAIN
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN PARSONS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JARED KILEY
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MORRIS SMITH
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TUAN BUI
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAI QIAN
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFF KOLODZI
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN LEBAR
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHAD REESE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK ROWE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN ROJAS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS PALMQUIST
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATHEW EVANS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD JENKINS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT GEISS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRADLEY GRANT
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEREK VAN DEN TOP
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID PENROD
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT EDGAR
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACK WOODALL
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DALLAS WICKER
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEROME E. PEDERSON
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIGUEL QUEZADA
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWIN WILLIAM KRAUSE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROY HALEEN
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BENJAMIN LUKE
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHMED J. CANNON
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM CHURCH
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL FERNANDEZ
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: S. GARRETT BECK
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SHELDON
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYLE DUNAHOO
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANDRES FREY, individuals, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAN ENGWIS
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER GOETZMAN
Represented By: K.L. Myles
Represented By: Andre Emilio Jardini Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM D. PILGRIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: April N. Ross
Represented By: Gregory Oxford
Represented By: Andrew Holmer
Represented By: Kathleen Taylor Sooy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?