Anthony Patel v. Patricia Miller, et al
Defendant: SIDLEY & AUSTIN, EISNER JAFFE, LYNNE MCCULLOUGH, HINSHAW AND CULBERTSON LLP, MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP, DESMOND J. HINDS, CLAUDIA LINN STONE, MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS, SARAH L. OVERTON, AKERMAN LLP, COLE & LOETERMAN, PERKINS COIE LLP, JACQUELINE BOGGS, CUMMINGS, MCCLOREY, DAVIS, ACHO AND ASSOCIATES P.C., GREENSPOON MARDER, P.A., DOES, 1-10, inclusive, INGLIS LEDBETTER AND GOWER, FRANK W. NEMECEK, GLEN BUZARD, JENNIFER VILLEBRO, DLA PIPER (US) LLP, MEYERS, NAVE, RIBACK, SILVER & WILSON, PLC, THE PHILLIPS FIRM, JANET A. NAPOLITANO, YUK LAW, FILOMENA E. MEYER, JAMES H. TURKEN, JONATHAN BERRES COLE, MICHAEL L. TROPE, ALI FISHBEIN, K&L GATES LLP and DAVID GRIFFIN
Defendant / Appellee: MEYER OLSON LOWY AND MEYERS, NEMECEK AND COLE, AKSHAI RUNCHAL, GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP, DECAROLIS FAMILY LAW GROUP, PARUL BHATIA, CHARLES ROBINSON, General Counsel University of California Office of the President, MCLA PSYCHIATRIC MEDICAL GROUP, TROPE FEIN, DIVYA RUNCHAL, GREGORY HENDEY, LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP, DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP, BLANK ROME LLP, REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, GREGORY G. LYNCH, SCHMID AND VOILES, BOREN, OSHER AND LUFTMAN LLP, DOUGLAS NIES, JOHANNA KLOHN, JAFFE CLEMENS, LUKAS ALEXANIAN, HEALTH INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES, STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA, BARTLEY L. BECKER, AMIT RUNCHAL, JORDAN D. GROTZINGER, ATILLA UNER, SUMEET BHATIA, RAKSHA BHATIA, JOEL SACHS, LAW AND BRANDMEYER, LLP, JOHN C. MAZZIOTTA, CEO, UCLA Health, BUTER, BUZARD, FISHBEIN & ROYCE, LLP, RACHEL MCROSKEY, WASSER, COOPERMAN AND MANDLES, PC, EISNER JAFFEE, SILVER LAW GROUP, PATRICIA MILLER, BENNER AND BOON LLP and JEREMY JAMES OSHER
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY A. PATEL
Case Number: 19-56285
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 Streamlined request [9] by Appellant Anthony A. Patel to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Anthony A. Patel opening brief due 03/13/2020. Appellees Lukas Alexanian, Bartley L. Becker, Benner and Boon LLP, Parul Bhatia, Raksha Bhatia, Sumeet Bhatia, Blank Rome LLP, Boren, Osher and Luftman LLP, Buter, Buzard, Fishbein & Royce, LLP, Jaffe Clemens, Decarolis Family Law Group, Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Trope Fein, Greenberg Traurig LLP, Jordan D. Grotzinger, Health Information Management Services, Gregory Hendey, Eisner Jaffee, Johanna Klohn, Law and Brandmeyer, LLP, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, Gregory G. Lynch, MCLA Psychiatric Medical Group, John C. Mazziotta, Rachel McRoskey, Meyer Olson Lowy and Meyers, Patricia Miller, Nemecek and Cole, Douglas Nies, Jeremy James Osher, Regents of the University of California, Charles Robinson, Akshai Runchal, Amit Runchal, Divya Runchal, Joel Sachs, Schmid and Voiles, Silver Law Group, State Bar of California, Atilla Uner and Wasser, Cooperman and Mandles, PC answering brief due 04/13/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11526661] (JN) [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:01 AM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Anthony A. Patel. New requested due date is 03/13/2020. [11526561] [19-56285] (Patel, Anthony) [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:52 AM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Marco A. Pulido, Mary-Christine Sungaila for party(s) Appellee Patricia Miller Appellee Johanna Klohn Appellee John C. Mazziotta Appellee Atilla Uner Appellee Regents of the University of California Appellee Gregory Hendey Appellee Charles Robinson, in case 19-56285. [11521596] (QDL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:42 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 Terminated Mark Schaeffer for Claudia Linn Stone, Frank W. Nemecek and Jonathan Berres Cole in 19-56285 [11521565] (TYL) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:33 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mary-Christine Sungaila (Haynes and Boone, LLP, 600 Anton Blvd, Suite 700, Costa Mesa CA 92626) for Appellees Regents of the University of California, Gregory Hendey, Patricia Miller, Johanna Klohn, Atilla Uner, Charles Robinson and John C. Mazziotta. Date of service: 12/04/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11521522] [19-56285] (Sungaila, Mary-Christine) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:21 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marco A Pulido (Haynes and Boone, LLP, 600 Anton Blvd, Suite 700, Costa Mesa CA 92626) for Appellees Regents of the University of California, Gregory Hendey, Patricia Miller, Johanna Klohn, Atilla Uner, Charles Robinson and John C. Mazziotta. Date of service: 12/04/2019. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11521497] [19-56285] (Pulido, Marco) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:14 PM]
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): The request to correct the docket to reflect that Frank W. Nemeck, Claudia Linn Stone, and Jonathan Berres Cole are not defendants-appellees in this appeal (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted. See 9th Cir. Gen. Ord. Appendix A (29). The Clerk will update the docket to designate Frank W. Nemeck, Claudia Linn Stone, and Jonathan Berres Cole as defendants rather than defendants-appellees. The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [11521473] (HC) [Entered: 12/04/2019 04:07 PM]
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Mail returned on 11/18/2019 addressed to Timothy Donahoe for Jeremy James Osher, Rachel McRoskey and Boren, Osher and Luftman LLP, re: 11/07/2019 case opening information [ # 1 ]. Returned envelope notes: return to sender, insufficient address, unable to forward. Resending to: Donahoe & Young, 16133 Ventura Boulevard, 7th Floor, Encino, CA 91436-2403. [11503152]--[Edited: address updated. 11/19/2019 by SLM] (QDL) [Entered: 11/18/2019 05:10 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellee Nemecek and Cole Correspondence: Request that this court correct its record/docket to reflect that Frank W. Nemecek, Claudia Linn Stone, and Jonathan Berres Cole are not appellees.. Date of service: 11/14/2019 [11499246] [19-56285] (Schaeffer, Mark) [Entered: 11/14/2019 01:41 PM]
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 12/04/2019. Transcript due 01/03/2020. Appellant Anthony A. Patel opening brief due 02/12/2020. Appellees Lukas Alexanian, Bartley L. Becker, Benner and Boon LLP, Parul Bhatia, Raksha Bhatia, Sumeet Bhatia, Blank Rome LLP, Boren, Osher and Luftman LLP, Buter, Buzard, Fishbein & Royce, LLP, Jaffe Clemens, Jonathan Berres Cole, Decarolis Family Law Group, Dickstein Shapiro LLP, Trope Fein, Greenberg Traurig LLP, Jordan D. Grotzinger, Health Information Management Services, Gregory Hendey, Eisner Jaffee, Johanna Klohn, Law and Brandmeyer, LLP, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP, Gregory G. Lynch, MCLA Psychiatric Medical Group, John C. Mazziotta, Rachel McRoskey, Meyer Olson Lowy and Meyers, Patricia Miller, Frank W. Nemecek, Nemecek and Cole, Douglas Nies, Jeremy James Osher, Regents of the University of California, Charles Robinson, Akshai Runchal, Amit Runchal, Divya Runchal, Joel Sachs, Schmid and Voiles, Silver Law Group, State Bar of California, Claudia Linn Stone, Atilla Uner and Wasser, Cooperman and Mandles, PC answering brief due 03/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11492959] (JBS) [Entered: 11/07/2019 03:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Patel v. Patricia Miller, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDLEY & AUSTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EISNER JAFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNNE MCCULLOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HINSHAW AND CULBERTSON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESMOND J. HINDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAUDIA LINN STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH L. OVERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKERMAN LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLE & LOETERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERKINS COIE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELINE BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINGS, MCCLOREY, DAVIS, ACHO AND ASSOCIATES P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENSPOON MARDER, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGLIS LEDBETTER AND GOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANK W. NEMECEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLEN BUZARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER VILLEBRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLA PIPER (US) LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEYERS, NAVE, RIBACK, SILVER & WILSON, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PHILLIPS FIRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANET A. NAPOLITANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUK LAW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FILOMENA E. MEYER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES H. TURKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN BERRES COLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL L. TROPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALI FISHBEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&L GATES LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEYER OLSON LOWY AND MEYERS
Represented By: Patrick M. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEMECEK AND COLE
Represented By: Mark Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AKSHAI RUNCHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP
Represented By: Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DECAROLIS FAMILY LAW GROUP
Represented By: Filomena E. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARUL BHATIA
Represented By: Jeremy James Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES ROBINSON, General Counsel University of California Office of the President
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MCLA PSYCHIATRIC MEDICAL GROUP
Represented By: Kenneth R. Pedroza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TROPE FEIN
Represented By: Filomena E. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIVYA RUNCHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY HENDEY
Represented By: Morgan Ashleigh Metzger Esquire
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Kenneth Maranga Esquire
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH, LLP
Represented By: Patrik Johansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DICKSTEIN SHAPIRO LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLANK ROME LLP
Represented By: Mark Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Morgan Ashleigh Metzger Esquire
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Kenneth Maranga Esquire
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY G. LYNCH
Represented By: Patrik Johansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCHMID AND VOILES
Represented By: Howard N. Wollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOREN, OSHER AND LUFTMAN LLP
Represented By: Timothy Donahoe
Represented By: Timothy C. Donahoe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOUGLAS NIES
Represented By: Joan E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHANNA KLOHN
Represented By: Morgan Ashleigh Metzger Esquire
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Kenneth Maranga Esquire
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAFFE CLEMENS
Represented By: Gregory P. Korn
Represented By: Dale F. Kinsella Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUKAS ALEXANIAN
Represented By: Kenneth R. Pedroza
Represented By: Dana Stenvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HEALTH INFORMATION MANAGEMENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARTLEY L. BECKER
Represented By: Patrik Johansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMIT RUNCHAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JORDAN D. GROTZINGER
Represented By: Alexander Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATILLA UNER
Represented By: Morgan Ashleigh Metzger Esquire
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Kenneth Maranga Esquire
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUMEET BHATIA
Represented By: Jeremy James Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAKSHA BHATIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOEL SACHS
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW AND BRANDMEYER, LLP
Represented By: Zachary Schwake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN C. MAZZIOTTA, CEO, UCLA Health
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUTER, BUZARD, FISHBEIN & ROYCE, LLP
Represented By: Mark Schaeffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RACHEL MCROSKEY
Represented By: Timothy Donahoe
Represented By: Timothy C. Donahoe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WASSER, COOPERMAN AND MANDLES, PC
Represented By: Jon R. Schwalbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EISNER JAFFEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SILVER LAW GROUP
Represented By: David E. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICIA MILLER
Represented By: Morgan Ashleigh Metzger Esquire
Represented By: Patricia E. Ellyatt
Represented By: Kenneth Maranga Esquire
Represented By: Marco A. Pulido
Represented By: Mary-Christine Sungaila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BENNER AND BOON LLP
Represented By: Brett A. Boon Esquire
Represented By: Craig Benner Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEREMY JAMES OSHER
Represented By: Timothy Donahoe
Represented By: Timothy C. Donahoe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY A. PATEL
Represented By: Anthony A. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?