Karen Panosyan v. Kirstjen Nielsen, et al
Respondent / Appellee: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, JASON PARK, Captain; in his official capacity as Commander, Theo Lacy Facility, ANDRE QUINONES, in his official capacity as Assistant Field Office Director for Orange County Detained Facilities, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, QUANG QUACH, in his official capacity as Officer-in-Charge, Theo Lacy Facility, SANDRA HUTCHENS, in her official capacity as Sheriff of Orange County, RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States and DAVID MARIN, in his official capacity as Los Angeles Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner / Appellant: KAREN PANOSYAN
Case Number: 19-56315
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The opening brief is due February 10, 2020; the answering brief is due March 11, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. (MOATT) [11554018] (AF) [Entered: 01/07/2020 04:01 PM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Karen Panosyan Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Form 4). Date of service: 12/16/2019. [11534370] [19-56315] (Brooks, Carlo) [Entered: 12/16/2019 06:26 PM]
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 12/20/2019, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11523609] (VS) [Entered: 12/06/2019 10:29 AM]
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11511101] (TSP) [Entered: 11/25/2019 12:51 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/21/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11508192]. [19-56315] (AD) [Entered: 11/21/2019 06:44 PM]
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Karen Panosyan Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/21/2019. [11508180] [19-56315]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF of mediation questionnaire. 11/26/2019 by QDL] (Brooks, Carlo) [Entered: 11/21/2019 06:31 PM]
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Karen Panosyan Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/21/2019. Appellant Karen Panosyan opening brief due 01/14/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Sandra Hutchens, David Marin, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jason Park, Quang Quach, Andre Quinones and Ronald D. Vitiello answering brief due 02/14/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11498628] (RT) [Entered: 11/14/2019 09:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen Panosyan v. Kirstjen Nielsen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, in her official capacity as Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JASON PARK, Captain; in his official capacity as Commander, Theo Lacy Facility
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ANDRE QUINONES, in his official capacity as Assistant Field Office Director for Orange County Detained Facilities, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: QUANG QUACH, in his official capacity as Officer-in-Charge, Theo Lacy Facility
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SANDRA HUTCHENS, in her official capacity as Sheriff of Orange County
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DAVID MARIN, in his official capacity as Los Angeles Field Office Director, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Rebekah Nahas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KAREN PANOSYAN
Represented By: Carlo Brooks
Represented By: Robert G. Berke Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?