Scott Meide, et al v. Noah Centineo, et al
Defendant / Appellee: JULIE C. NATALE, BRAD JASHINSKY, LOUIS N. HAMEL, CPA, GREG CENTINO, ANTHONY LG, PLLC, FKA Legal and Compliance, LLC, JOHN A. KING, WILLIAM SADLEIR, CLARIUS CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, CLARIUS RELEASING, LLC, NATALIE J. KING, JUDI BECKER, STEVE TEJADA, DANA TEJADA, CW3PR, LLC, CHARLIE C. WALTERS, DOES, Others Unknown, KELLEE ANDRES CENTINEO, SVETLANA CARROLL, MICHAEL E. WILFORD, CPA, DEBORAH TEXTOR, JOHN M. GATTI, Esquire, STEREO VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC., AVIRON PICTURES, LLC, ALPINE PICTURES, INC., NICK CENTINO, ADDISON TEXTOR, RENE A. TORRES, AVIRON CAPITAL, LLC, SHELDON RABINOWITZ, O'MELVENY LAW FIRM, CHRIS MCGARAHAN, NOAH CENTINEO, JAMES E. ROBERTS, AGNES KING, CLARIUS ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, DAVID SUGARMAN, TARA K. GLASER, BRANDON KRAMER, RYAN CARROLL, RICH CARROLL, CHRISTIE HSIAO, KEVIN TRUDEAU, THE VELARDI GROUP, LLC, ROLAND CARROLL, GREG KRAMER, ROBERT LAIMO, HYDE PARK ENTERTAINMENT, INC., MICHAEL K. DOUGLAS, WAYNE KRAMER, ROBERT CENTINEO, CLAIRE HEATH, JEFF URDANK, BONNIE RADFORD, JOY KRAMER, NEIL L. KAUFMAN, FRANK PATTERSON, PETER VELARDI, MARC J. LANE, JOHN TEXTOR, SUMMERTIME ENTERTAINMENT, LAURA ANTHONY, Esquire and JOHN JACK HONOUR
Plaintiff / Appellant: KYLE A. JANES, MERLYN HEGLAND, SCOTT MEIDE, DAVID HEGLAND, DAWN HEGLAND and NATHAN HILL
Case Number: 19-56402
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 42 Attorney Justin M. Bongco in 19-56402 substituted by Attorney Deven T. Klee in 19-56402 [11619711] (CW) [Entered: 03/05/2020 03:11 PM]
March 5, 2020 Filing 41 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deven T. Klee (Winston & Strawn LLP, 333 S. Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543) for Appellee Kevin Trudeau. Substitution for Attorney Justin M. Bongco for Appellee Kevin Trudeau. Date of service: 03/05/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11619651] [19-56402] (Klee, Deven) [Entered: 03/05/2020 02:49 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 40 Filed (ECF) Appellees Judi Becker and Claire Heath response joining motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/27/2020. [11611134] [19-56402] (Antoni, John) [Entered: 02/27/2020 12:07 PM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 39 Attorneys Betty M. Shumener, John D Spurling and Betty M. Shumener in 19-56402 substituted by Attorneys John Antoni, John Antoni and John Antoni in 19-56402 [11611108] (SLM) [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:53 AM]
February 27, 2020 Filing 38 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John David Antoni (ANTONI ALBUS, LLP, 11836 W. Pico Boulevard, Los Angeles, CA 90064) for Appellees Judi Becker and Claire Heath. Substitution for Betty M. Shumener, Esquire, John D Spurling. Date of service: 02/27/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11611092]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Attorney substituting as counsel for fewer than all of the parties currently represented by the substituted attorney.] (SLM) [Entered: 02/27/2020 11:49 AM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 37 Filed (ECF) Appellee William Sadleir response joining motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/26/2020. [11609734] [19-56402] (Antoni, John) [Entered: 02/26/2020 01:08 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 36 Attorneys Betty M. Shumener and John D Spurling in 19-56402 substituted by Attorneys John Antoni and John Antoni in 19-56402 [11609677] (SLM) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:29 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 35 Deleted Incorrect Entry. Entered in error. [11609672] (SLM) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:23 PM]
February 26, 2020 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John David Antoni (ANTONI ALBUS, LLP, 11836 W. Pico Boulevard, Los Angeles, CA 90064) for Appellee William Sadleir. Substitution for Betty M. Shumener, Esquire, John D Spurling. Date of service: 02/26/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11609671]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Attorney substituting as counsel for fewer than all of the parties currently represented by the substituted attorney.] (SLM) [Entered: 02/26/2020 12:22 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 33 Streamlined request by Appellees Addison Textor, Deborah Textor and John Textor to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. Briefing shall be reset as necessary upon the Courts disposition of the motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Dockets [12,17,19] See 9th Cir. R. 27-11.See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11609022] (DLM) [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:37 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Appellees Addison Textor, Deborah Textor and John Textor response joining motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/25/2020. [11608893] [19-56402] (Arouh, Kimberly) [Entered: 02/25/2020 04:28 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 31 Added Attorney Kimberly Arouh for Appellees Deborah Textor, Addison Textor and John Textor, in case 19-56402. [11608735] (HH) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:33 PM]
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kimberly Arouh (BUCHANAN INGERSOLL & ROONEY LLP, 600 West Broadway, Suite 1100, San Diego, CA 92101) for Appellees Addison Textor, Deborah Textor and John Textor. Date of service: 02/25/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11608649] [19-56402] (Arouh, Kimberly) [Entered: 02/25/2020 03:03 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 29 Streamlined request [28], [27] by Appellees John M. Gatti, Esquire and Sheldon Rabinowitz to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. Briefing shall be reset as necessary upon the Courts disposition of the motions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Dockets [12,17,19] See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [11607447] (DLM) [Entered: 02/24/2020 05:22 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee Sheldon Rabinowitz. New requested due date is 03/26/2020. [11606758] [19-56402] (Foster, Richard) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:40 PM]
February 24, 2020 Filing 27 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee John M. Gatti, Esquire. New requested due date is 03/27/2020. [11606681] [19-56402] (Barrow, Amanda) [Entered: 02/24/2020 01:17 PM]
February 18, 2020 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) Appellee Frank Patterson response joining motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/18/2020. [11599884] [19-56402] (McPherson, Edwin) [Entered: 02/18/2020 11:51 AM]
February 17, 2020 Filing 25 Filed (ECF) Appellants David Hegland, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, Kyle A. Janes and Scott Meide response to motion (motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, , , motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, motion to join in existing brief (ECF), motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, , motion to withdraw as counsel). Date of service: 02/17/2020. [11598903] [19-56402] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 2/18/2020 by TYL] (Meide, Scott) [Entered: 02/17/2020 06:42 AM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 24 Filed (ECF) Appellees Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Claire Heath and William Sadleir motion. Attorney(s) Attorney Betty M. Shumener, Esquire for Appellees Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Claire Heath and William Sadleir motion to withdraw as counsel. Date of service: 02/14/2020. [11598806] [19-56402] (Shumener, Betty) [Entered: 02/14/2020 05:58 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 23 Added Attorney(s) Alan Jay Weil, Corey E. klein for party(s) Appellee John M. Gatti, in case 19-56402. [11598432] (CW) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:00 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) Appellee John M. Gatti, Esquire response joining motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/14/2020. [11598421] [19-56402] (Barrow, Amanda) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:57 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alan Jay Weil (Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP, 10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 1725, Los Angeles, California 90067.) for Appellee John M. Gatti, Esquire. Date of service: 02/14/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11598365] [19-56402] (Weil, Alan) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:42 PM]
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Corey Evan Klein (Kendall Brill & Kelly LLP 10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 1725, Los Angeles, California 90067.) for Appellee John M. Gatti, Esquire. Date of service: 02/14/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11598285] [19-56402] (klein, Corey) [Entered: 02/14/2020 02:20 PM]
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellee Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 02/12/2020. [11595656] [19-56402] (Wahl, Joseph) [Entered: 02/12/2020 05:00 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellees Louis N. Hamel and Michael E. Wilford Motion to join in Opening brief filed on and Response to motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/11/2020. [11594114] [19-56402] (Yanni, Rebekah) [Entered: 02/11/2020 05:07 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellee Sheldon Rabinowitz Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 02/11/2020. [11594101] [19-56402] (Foster, Richard) [Entered: 02/11/2020 04:57 PM]
February 11, 2020 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Appellees Anthony LG, PLLC and Laura Anthony, Esquire response joining motion (motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction). Date of service: 02/11/2020. [11593771] [19-56402] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 2/14/2020 by TYL] (Gurnick, David) [Entered: 02/11/2020 03:32 PM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Appellee Kevin Trudeau response joining motion ([ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 12 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 02/10/2020. [11592357] [19-56402] (Bongco, Justin) [Entered: 02/10/2020 05:44 PM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 14 Added Attorney(s) Rebekah Yanni for party(s) Appellee Michael E. Wilford Appellee Louis N. Hamel, in case 19-56402. [11591903] (CW) [Entered: 02/10/2020 03:11 PM]
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rebekah Yanni (Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP, 11755 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 2400, Los Angeles, CA 90025) for Appellees Louis N. Hamel and Michael E. Wilford. Date of service: 02/10/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11591779] [19-56402] (Yanni, Rebekah) [Entered: 02/10/2020 02:41 PM]
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Appellees Greg Centino, Kellee Andres Centineo, Nick Centino, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, Agnes King, John A. King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, Peter Velardi, The Velardi Group, LLC, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane and Natalie J. King Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Date of service: 02/07/2020. [11589803] [19-56402] (Stein, Giel) [Entered: 02/07/2020 01:27 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) Vincent S. Green for party(s) Appellee Michael E. Wilford Appellee Louis N. Hamel, in case 19-56402. [11584656] (CW) [Entered: 02/04/2020 11:29 AM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Vincent Scott Green (Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP, 11755 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 2400, Los Angeles, CA 90025) for Appellees Louis N. Hamel and Michael E. Wilford. Date of service: 02/04/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11584450] [19-56402] (Green, Vincent) [Entered: 02/04/2020 10:52 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 8 ] submitted by Appellants is filed. No paper copies are required at this time. [11580178] (LA) [Entered: 01/30/2020 04:58 PM]
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants David Hegland, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, Kyle A. Janes and Scott Meide. Date of service: 01/27/2020. [11574444] [19-56402]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached searchable PDF. 01/30/2020 by LA] (Meide, Scott) [Entered: 01/27/2020 06:31 AM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Giel Stein for party(s) Appellee Tara K. Glaser Appellee Agnes King Appellee Julie C. Natale Appellee Peter Velardi Appellee Kellee Andres Centineo Appellee Robert Centineo Appellee Greg Centino Appellee Noah Centineo Appellee Brandon Kramer Appellee Natalie J. King Appellee John A. King Appellee Robert Laimo Appellee Marc J. Lane Appellee James E. Roberts Appellee Nick Centino Appellee Joy Kramer Appellee Greg Kramer Appellee The Velardi Group, LLC Appellee Chris McGarahan, in case 19-56402. [11572028] (CW) [Entered: 01/23/2020 02:07 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Giel Stein (Clark Hill PLC, 130 East Randolph Street, Suite 3900, Chicago, IL 60601) for Appellees Greg Centino, Kellee Andres Centineo, Nick Centino, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, Agnes King, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC and Peter Velardi. Date of service: 01/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11571921] [19-56402] (Stein, Giel) [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:39 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Maureen J. Moody (Clark Hill PLC, 130 East Randolph Street, Suite 3900, Chicago, IL 60601) for Appellees Greg Centino, Kellee Andres Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Tara K. Glaser, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC, Peter Velardi, Agnes King and Nick Centino. Substitution for Attorney Ms. Maureen J. Moody for Appellees Kellee Andres Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Greg Centino, Nick Centino, Tara K. Glaser, Agnes King, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, James E. Roberts, The Velardi Group, LLC and Peter Velardi. Date of service: 01/23/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11571889] [19-56402] (Moody, Maureen) [Entered: 01/23/2020 01:22 PM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 Streamlined request [3] by Appellee O'Melveny Law Firm to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is premature. The opening brief has not been filed. [11562152] (JN) [Entered: 01/14/2020 03:03 PM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellee O'Melveny Law Firm. New requested due date is 03/27/2020. [11562008] [19-56402] (Yoder, Michael) [Entered: 01/14/2020 02:18 PM]
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 12/09/2019. [11525977] (BY) [Entered: 12/09/2019 02:47 PM]
November 29, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants David Hegland, Dawn Hegland, Merlyn Hegland, Nathan Hill, Kyle A. Janes and Scott Meide opening brief due 01/27/2020. Appellees Alpine Pictures, Inc., Laura Anthony, Anthony LG, PLLC, Aviron Capital, LLC, Aviron Pictures, LLC, Judi Becker, CW3PR, LLC, Rich Carroll, Roland Carroll, Ryan Carroll, Svetlana Carroll, Kellee Andres Centineo, Noah Centineo, Robert Centineo, Greg Centino, Nick Centino, Clarius Capital Group, LLC, Clarius Entertainment, LLC, Clarius Releasing, LLC, Does, Michael K. Douglas, John M. Gatti, Tara K. Glaser, Louis N. Hamel, Claire Heath, John Jack Honour, Christie Hsiao, Hyde Park Entertainment, Inc., Brad Jashinsky, Neil L. Kaufman, Agnes King, John A. King, Natalie J. King, Brandon Kramer, Greg Kramer, Joy Kramer, Wayne Kramer, Robert Laimo, Marc J. Lane, Chris McGarahan, Julie C. Natale, O'Melveny Law Firm, Frank Patterson, Sheldon Rabinowitz, Bonnie Radford, James E. Roberts, William Sadleir, Stereo Vision Entertainment, Inc., David Sugarman, Summertime Entertainment, Dana Tejada, Steve Tejada, Addison Textor, Deborah Textor, John Textor, The Velardi Group, LLC, Rene A. Torres, Kevin Trudeau, Jeff Urdank, Peter Velardi, Charlie C. Walters and Michael E. Wilford answering brief due 02/26/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11515925] (JBS) [Entered: 11/29/2019 11:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Scott Meide, et al v. Noah Centineo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JULIE C. NATALE
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD JASHINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOUIS N. HAMEL, CPA
Represented By: Barry Z. Brodsky
Represented By: Vincent S. Green Esquire
Represented By: Rebekah Yanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG CENTINO
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY LG, PLLC, FKA Legal and Compliance, LLC
Represented By: David Gurnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN A. KING
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM SADLEIR
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Represented By: John Antoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLARIUS CAPITAL GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLARIUS RELEASING, LLC
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATALIE J. KING
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JUDI BECKER
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Represented By: John Antoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVE TEJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANA TEJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CW3PR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLIE C. WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, Others Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLEE ANDRES CENTINEO
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SVETLANA CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL E. WILFORD, CPA
Represented By: Barry Z. Brodsky
Represented By: Vincent S. Green Esquire
Represented By: Rebekah Yanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEBORAH TEXTOR
Represented By: Richard G. Salazar
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN M. GATTI, Esquire
Represented By: Amanda Barrow
Represented By: Corey E. klein Esquire
Represented By: Alan Jay Weil Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEREO VISION ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AVIRON PICTURES, LLC
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALPINE PICTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICK CENTINO
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ADDISON TEXTOR
Represented By: Richard G. Salazar
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RENE A. TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AVIRON CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELDON RABINOWITZ
Represented By: David R. Euredjian
Represented By: Richard M. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: O'MELVENY LAW FIRM
Represented By: Michael G. Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRIS MCGARAHAN
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOAH CENTINEO
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES E. ROBERTS
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AGNES KING
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLARIUS ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID SUGARMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TARA K. GLASER
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRANDON KRAMER
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICH CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIE HSIAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN TRUDEAU
Represented By: Justin M. Bongco
Represented By: Deven T. Klee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE VELARDI GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROLAND CARROLL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREG KRAMER
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT LAIMO
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HYDE PARK ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Joseph M. Wahl Esquire
Represented By: Joseph Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL K. DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WAYNE KRAMER
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT CENTINEO
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLAIRE HEATH
Represented By: Betty M. Shumener Esquire
Represented By: John D. Spurling
Represented By: John Antoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFF URDANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BONNIE RADFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOY KRAMER
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEIL L. KAUFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FRANK PATTERSON
Represented By: Edwin F. McPherson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER VELARDI
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARC J. LANE
Represented By: Maureen J. Moody
Represented By: Giel Stein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN TEXTOR
Represented By: Richard G. Salazar
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUMMERTIME ENTERTAINMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAURA ANTHONY, Esquire
Represented By: David Gurnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN JACK HONOUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KYLE A. JANES
Represented By: Kyle A. Janes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MERLYN HEGLAND
Represented By: Merlyn Hegland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT MEIDE
Represented By: Scott Meide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID HEGLAND
Represented By: David Hegland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAWN HEGLAND
Represented By: Dawn Hegland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATHAN HILL
Represented By: Nathan Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?