Connie Dietrich v. The Boeing Company, et al
Defendant: SOCO WEST, INC., Brenntag West, Inc. f/k/a SOCO-Lynch Corporation successor in interest to Western Chemical and Manufacturing, Co., WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY, OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Owens-Illinois Glass Company, THE PEP BOYS - MANNY, MOE AND JACK OF CALIFORNIA, DOES, 1 through 400, inclusive, AUTOZONE WEST, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Chief Auto Parts, Inc., AKA Autozone, Inc., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, as successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, MASONEILAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Mason-Neilan Regulator Company and Annin Valve Co., METALCLAD INSULATION LLC, FKA Metalclad Insulation Corporation, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., individualIy and as siuccessor in interest to Allied Signal, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Bendix Corporation, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION and KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC
Plaintiff / Appellee: CONNIE DIETRICH, an individual
Defendant / Appellant: THE BOEING COMPANY, improperly denominated as The Boeing Company, individually and as successor by merger to McDonnell Douglas Corporation, successor by merger with Dougla Aircraft Company
Case Number: 19-56409
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 01/23/2020, 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 01/21/2020 ). [11551153] (VS) [Entered: 01/06/2020 08:16 AM]
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 01/21/2020, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11547900] (VS) [Entered: 12/31/2019 12:27 PM]
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant The Boeing Company Correspondence: The Boeing Company's Transcript Order Form (G-120) and The Boeing Company's Transcript Designation Form (G-126). Date of service: 12/17/2019 [11535052] [19-56409] (Karren, Brent) [Entered: 12/17/2019 11:10 AM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/10/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11527246]. [19-56409] (AD) [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:44 PM]
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant The Boeing Company Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/10/2019. [11527199] [19-56409] (Karren, Brent) [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:18 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant The Boeing Company Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/10/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/03/2020. Transcript due 02/03/2020. Appellant The Boeing Company opening brief due 03/12/2020. Appellee Connie Dietrich answering brief due 04/13/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11519701] (RT) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Connie Dietrich v. The Boeing Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCO WEST, INC., Brenntag West, Inc. f/k/a SOCO-Lynch Corporation successor in interest to Western Chemical and Manufacturing, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Owens-Illinois Glass Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PEP BOYS - MANNY, MOE AND JACK OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1 through 400, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUTOZONE WEST, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Chief Auto Parts, Inc., AKA Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, as successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASONEILAN INTERNATIONAL, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Mason-Neilan Regulator Company and Annin Valve Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METALCLAD INSULATION LLC, FKA Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., individualIy and as siuccessor in interest to Allied Signal, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONNIE DIETRICH, an individual
Represented By: Benno B. Ashrafi Esquire
Represented By: Tyler Robert Stock Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THE BOEING COMPANY, improperly denominated as The Boeing Company, individually and as successor by merger to McDonnell Douglas Corporation, successor by merger with Dougla Aircraft Company
Represented By: Brent M. Karren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?