Bert Thompson v. Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder, et al
Defendant / Appellee: BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS, LLP, DOES, 1 through 10 inclusive, MORTGAGE PASS THRU CERTIFICATES, NCI BY SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, its attorney in fact, all persons unknown, claiming any legal or quitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title, LSI TITLE COMPANY, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for HSI Asset Securitization Trust 2007-NCI, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVING, its attorney in fact, all persons unknown, claiming any legal or quitable right, title, estate, hen, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title, or any cloud on plaintiff's title ther
Plaintiff / Appellant: BERT THOMPSON
Case Number: 19-56460
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11590249] (BLS) [Entered: 02/07/2020 03:56 PM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/28/2020, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11561844] (BLS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 01:28 PM]
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11547377]. [19-56460] (AD) [Entered: 12/31/2019 06:44 AM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Bert Thompson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/30/2019. [11547341] [19-56460] (Antognini, Richard) [Entered: 12/30/2019 08:01 PM]
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11543208] (LW) [Entered: 12/24/2019 09:57 AM]
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Bert Thompson Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/23/2019. Transcript ordered by 01/13/2020. Transcript due 02/11/2020. Appellant Bert Thompson opening brief due 03/23/2020. Appellees America's Servicing Company, Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Does, LSI Title Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Mortgage Pass Thru Certificates, NCI by Specialized Loan Servicing, Specialized Loan Serving and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answering brief due 04/22/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11533011] (JBS) [Entered: 12/16/2019 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bert Thompson v. Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS, LLP
Represented By: James Thomas Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE PASS THRU CERTIFICATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NCI BY SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, its attorney in fact, all persons unknown, claiming any legal or quitable right, title, estate, lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LSI TITLE COMPANY
Represented By: Brian S. Edwards Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, as Trustee for HSI Asset Securitization Trust 2007-NCI
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Timothy M. Ryan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICA'S SERVICING COMPANY
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel Esquire
Represented By: J. Barrett Marum Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Edward D. Vogel Esquire
Represented By: J. Barrett Marum Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVING, its attorney in fact, all persons unknown, claiming any legal or quitable right, title, estate, hen, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title, or any cloud on plaintiff's title ther
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Represented By: Timothy M. Ryan Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BERT THOMPSON
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Antognini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?