Ammar Hachicho v. Kevin McAleenan, et al
Respondent / Appellee: RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), GABRIEL VALDEZ, in his official capacity as Assistant Field Office Director, Adelanto Detention Facility, ICE, JAMES JANECKA, in his official capacity as Warden of the Adelanto Detention Facility, MARISA FLORES, in her official capacity as Deputy Field Office Director, Detention and Removal Management, ICE, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, THOMAS P. GILES, in his official capacity as Acting Los Angeles Field Office Director, ICE and WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Petitioner / Appellant: AMMAR YOUSSEF HACHICHO
Case Number: 19-56493
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: TSP) Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. (Order dated 01/02/2020), This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. [11593906] (TSP) [Entered: 02/11/2020 03:59 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11578129] (BLS) [Entered: 01/29/2020 11:44 AM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. By 01/28/2020, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform the Circuit Mediator by email of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested... This communication should not be filed with the court... The existing briefing schedule remains in effect... [11561825] (BLS) [Entered: 01/14/2020 01:22 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Jeffrey Ronald Meyer for party(s) Appellee William P. Barr, in case 19-56493. [11551984] (JFF) [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:56 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeffrey Ronald Meyer (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Office of Immigration Litigation, P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, D.C. 20044-0878) for Appellee William P. Barr. Date of service: 01/06/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11551902] [19-56493] (Meyer, Jeffrey) [Entered: 01/06/2020 01:20 PM]
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11548578] (TSP) [Entered: 01/02/2020 09:06 AM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/30/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11547329]. [19-56493] (AD) [Entered: 12/30/2019 06:44 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ammar Youssef Hachicho Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/30/2019. [11547312] [19-56493] (Brooks, Carlo) [Entered: 12/30/2019 06:06 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ammar Youssef Hachicho Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/30/2019. Appellant Ammar Youssef Hachicho opening brief due 02/18/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Marisa Flores, Thomas P. Giles, James Janecka, Kevin K. McAleenan, Gabriel Valdez and Ronald D. Vitiello answering brief due 03/19/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11542893] (HC) [Entered: 12/23/2019 04:48 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ammar Hachicho v. Kevin McAleenan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RONALD D. VITIELLO, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: GABRIEL VALDEZ, in his official capacity as Assistant Field Office Director, Adelanto Detention Facility, ICE
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JAMES JANECKA, in his official capacity as Warden of the Adelanto Detention Facility
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: MARISA FLORES, in her official capacity as Deputy Field Office Director, Detention and Removal Management, ICE
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: THOMAS P. GILES, in his official capacity as Acting Los Angeles Field Office Director, ICE
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Timothy Biche
Represented By: Jeffrey Ronald Meyer Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: AMMAR YOUSSEF HACHICHO
Represented By: Carlo Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?