Charlie Orea, et al v. Quality Loan Service Corp., et al
Defendant / Appellee: KEVIN R. MCCARTHY, individually, and as Director of Quality Loan Service Corporation, SAMUEL KOUNGRES, individually, SHELLEY O'MALLEY, an individual, DOES, 1-10, ASHLEY BROOKE HENNESSEE, MARIE SOBERAN, individually, WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as TRUSTEE for the Certificateholders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II, Inc., CrreenPoint MTA Trust 2006-AR2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2, and WELLS FARGO NATIONAL ASSOCIATION as, KAITLIN PRESTON, Individually, and as employee of MCCARTHY AND HOLTHUS LLP; (or successors), STACY SPOHN, individually, FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY NATIONWIDE POSTING AND PUBLICATION, JAMES C. MORRIS, individually, KATHY KALOUSEK, Realtor at Coldwell Banker, KATHERINE A. DAVIS, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation, QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, a California corporation, RONALD ALONZO, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation, STARLENE STARLING, BOULET LOVAN, individually, and as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation, NATIONWIDE POSTING AND PUBLICATION, INC., RICHARD P. STEELMAN, Jr., individually, and as and employee of Bryan Cave, LLP, LIQUENDA ALLOTEY, individually, MERDAUD JAFARNIA, individually, and as employee of McCarthy and Holthus LLP, CONCEPCION LEGASPI, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation, KATHLENE DANAHER RUSH, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation, JOVONNE M. PHILLIPS, individually, and as employee of McCarthy and Holthus LLP, GREENPOINT MTA TRUST 2006 AR2 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 AR2 and SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: CHARLIE OREA and BRENDA OREA
Case Number: 19-56529
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): A review of court records reflects that each appellant filed a motion and affidavit for leave to appeal in forma pauperis in the district court. The January 3, 2020 order is therefore discharged. The motions to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]; District Court Docket Entry Nos. 124 and 125) are granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. The opening brief is due March 11, 2020; the answering brief is due April 10, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellants are proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellees supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. (MOATT) [11578867] (OC) [Entered: 01/29/2020 04:39 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SM): The court has received appellant Charlie Oreas motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The motion, however, is not accompanied by a completed financial affidavit. Within 21 days after the date of this order, each appellant shall complete and file a Form 4 financial affidavit. Failure to comply with this order may result in the denial of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall serve a Form 4 financial affidavit on each appellant. [11550903] (AF) [Entered: 01/03/2020 04:22 PM]
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 Filed Appellants Brenda Orea and Charlie Orea motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/26/2019. [11548158] (JBS) [Entered: 12/31/2019 02:53 PM]
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Brenda Orea and Charlie Orea opening brief due 02/24/2020. Appellees Liquenda Allotey, Ronald Alonzo, Katherine A. Davis, Does, First American Title Company Nationwide Posting and Publication, Greenpoint MTA Trust 2006 AR2 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2006 AR2, Ashley Brooke Hennessee, Merdaud Jafarnia, Kathy Kalousek, Samuel Koungres, Concepcion Legaspi, Boulet Lovan, Kevin R. McCarthy, James C. Morris, Nationwide Posting and Publication, Inc., Shelley O'Malley, Jovonne M. Phillips, Kaitlin Preston, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Kathlene Danaher Rush, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Marie Soberan, Stacy Spohn, Starlene Starling, Richard P. Steelman Jr. and Wells Fargo Bank National Association answering brief due 03/25/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11548149] (JBS) [Entered: 12/31/2019 02:50 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charlie Orea, et al v. Quality Loan Service Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN R. MCCARTHY, individually, and as Director of Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMUEL KOUNGRES, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELLEY O'MALLEY, an individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ASHLEY BROOKE HENNESSEE
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIE SOBERAN, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as TRUSTEE for the Certificateholders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II, Inc., CrreenPoint MTA Trust 2006-AR2 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-AR2, and WELLS FARGO NATIONAL ASSOCIATION as
Represented By: Steven M. Dailey Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAITLIN PRESTON, Individually, and as employee of MCCARTHY AND HOLTHUS LLP; (or successors)
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STACY SPOHN, individually
Represented By: Glenn J. Plattner Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY NATIONWIDE POSTING AND PUBLICATION
Represented By: James H. Treadwell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES C. MORRIS, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHY KALOUSEK, Realtor at Coldwell Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHERINE A. DAVIS, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION, a California corporation
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RONALD ALONZO, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STARLENE STARLING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOULET LOVAN, individually, and as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONWIDE POSTING AND PUBLICATION, INC.
Represented By: James H. Treadwell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD P. STEELMAN, Jr., individually, and as and employee of Bryan Cave, LLP
Represented By: Glenn J. Plattner Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIQUENDA ALLOTEY, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MERDAUD JAFARNIA, individually, and as employee of McCarthy and Holthus LLP
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CONCEPCION LEGASPI, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHLENE DANAHER RUSH, as an employee of Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOVONNE M. PHILLIPS, individually, and as employee of McCarthy and Holthus LLP
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREENPOINT MTA TRUST 2006 AR2 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 AR2
Represented By: Steven M. Dailey Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Wilson Esquire
Represented By: Steven M. Dailey Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLIE OREA
Represented By: Charlie Orea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRENDA OREA
Represented By: Brenda Orea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?