National Family Farm Coalition, et al v. USEPA, et al
Petitioner: CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY, CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, NATIONAL FAMILY FARM COALITION and PESTICIDE ACTION NETWORK NORTH AMERICA
Respondent: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY and ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator
Undetermined: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 19-70115
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 3, 2020 Summary National Family Farm Coalition v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 23 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant further settlement discussions. [11201056] (BS) [Entered: 02/20/2019 12:18 PM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) Intervenor - Pending Monsanto Company response non-opposing motion ([ # 21 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 21 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file agency record). Date of service: 02/19/2019. [11198330] [19-70115] (Perry, Philip) [Entered: 02/19/2019 07:00 AM]
February 18, 2019 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Respondent USEPA Unopposed Motion to extend time to file the agency record until 04/12/2019. Date of service: 02/18/2019. [11198237] [19-70115] (Buckley, Sarah) [Entered: 02/18/2019 02:06 PM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 Terminated Paul Achitoff for Pesticide Action Network North America, National Family Farm Coalition, Center for Food Safety and Center for Biological Diversity in 19-70115 [11189827] (CW) [Entered: 02/14/2019 06:39 AM]
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Paul Achitoff, Esquire for Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 02/13/2019. [11189750] [19-70115] (Achitoff, Paul) [Entered: 02/13/2019 06:30 PM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Respondent USEPA Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [Entry of Protective Order governing confidentiality of certain documents in the administrative record]. Date of service: 02/12/2019. [11186674] [19-70115] (Buckley, Sarah) [Entered: 02/12/2019 08:19 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 17 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KS): Respondents motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 16 ]) to withdraw the motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted. Respondents motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 7 ]) to stay appellate proceedings is deemed withdrawn. [11178641] (AF) [Entered: 02/04/2019 04:05 PM]
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) Respondent USEPA Correspondence: Restoration of appropriations and withdrawal of motion to stay.. Date of service: 02/01/2019 [11176142] [19-70115] (Buckley, Sarah) [Entered: 02/01/2019 01:20 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 Added attorney Sarah A. Buckley for USEPA, in case 19-70115. [11173168] (CW) [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:27 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Sarah Ann Buckley for Respondents USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Date of service: 01/30/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11173151] [19-70115] (Buckley, Sarah) [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:20 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/13/2019, 1:30 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11169262] (BS) [Entered: 01/28/2019 01:23 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Entered appearance of Intervenor - Pending Monsanto Company. [11165387] (CW) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:46 PM]
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Monsanto Company Motion to intervene. Date of service: 01/24/2019. [11165217] [19-70115] (Perry, Philip) [Entered: 01/24/2019 12:36 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11160014] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 06:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11159825] [19-70115] (Van Saun, Amy) [Entered: 01/18/2019 04:26 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America response opposing motion ([ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 7 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11154237] [19-70115] (Kimbrell, George) [Entered: 01/15/2019 03:53 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Respondents USEPA and Andrew Wheeler Motion for miscellaneous relief [to Stay the Matter in Light of Lapse of Appropriations]. Date of service: 01/15/2019. [11153753] [19-70115] (Grosko, John) [Entered: 01/15/2019 12:39 PM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney John Brett Grosko for Andrew Wheeler USEPA, in case 19-70115. [11153001] (CW) [Entered: 01/15/2019 06:49 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John, Brett, Grosko for Respondents USEPA and Andrew Wheeler. Date of service: 01/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11152890] [19-70115] (Grosko, John) [Entered: 01/14/2019 05:59 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Added attorney Amy Luisa Van Saun for Center for Food Safety Center for Biological Diversity National Family Farm Coalition Pesticide Action Network North America, in case 19-70115. [11152010] (CW) [Entered: 01/14/2019 01:39 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amy Luisa van Saun for Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America. Date of service: 01/14/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11151819] [19-70115] (Van Saun, Amy) [Entered: 01/14/2019 12:23 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Petitioners Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America corporate disclosure statement. Date of service: 01/11/2019. [11150818] [19-70115] (Kimbrell, George) [Entered: 01/11/2019 04:30 PM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/18/2019. Petitioner brief due 04/01/2019 for Center for Biological Diversity, Center for Food Safety, National Family Farm Coalition and Pesticide Action Network North America. Respondent brief due 05/01/2019 for U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11150713] (WL) [Entered: 01/11/2019 03:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: National Family Farm Coalition, et al v. USEPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Represented By: Amy Luisa Van Saun Esquire
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Amy Luisa Van Saun Esquire
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: NATIONAL FAMILY FARM COALITION
Represented By: Amy Luisa Van Saun Esquire
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PESTICIDE ACTION NETWORK NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Amy Luisa Van Saun Esquire
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: MONSANTO COMPANY
Represented By: Philip J. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Jon Michael Lipshultz
Represented By: Sarah A. Buckley
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ANDREW WHEELER, in his official capacity as Administrator
Represented By: Jon Michael Lipshultz
Represented By: John Brett Grosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?