City of Casa Grande v. FAA

Petitioner: CITY OF CASA GRANDE
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 19-70137
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 Added attorney Joshua Revesz for FAA, in case 19-70137. [11203840] (JFF) [Entered: 02/22/2019 08:57 AM]
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joshua Revesz for Respondent FAA. Date of service: 02/22/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11203743] [19-70137] (Revesz, Joshua) [Entered: 02/22/2019 08:01 AM]
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - FurtherConference, 05/20/2019, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is vacated. A new briefing schedule will be set after the conference, if appropriate. See order for details. [11190368] (VS) [Entered: 02/14/2019 11:40 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Abby Christine Wright for FAA, in case 19-70137. [11166566] (JFF) [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:06 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Abby Christine Wright for Respondent FAA. Date of service: 01/25/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11166265] [19-70137] (Wright, Abby) [Entered: 01/25/2019 07:19 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - AssessmentConference, 02/14/2019, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11158662] (VS) [Entered: 01/18/2019 10:21 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/16/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11156376] (AD) [Entered: 01/16/2019 06:46 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Petitioner City of Casa Grande Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/16/2019. [11156029] [19-70137] (McCulloch, Timothy) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:31 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Petitioner City of Casa Grande Correspondence: Certificate of Service for Opening/Initial Documents. Date of service: 01/16/2019 [11155996] [19-70137] (McCulloch, Timothy) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:21 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Deleted incorrect entry. Entered in error. [11152806] (BY) [Entered: 01/14/2019 04:36 PM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2019. Petitioner brief due 04/04/2019 for City of Casa Grande. Respondent brief due 05/06/2019 for Federal Aviation Administration. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11152564] (BY) [Entered: 01/14/2019 03:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Casa Grande v. FAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF CASA GRANDE
Represented By: Timothy I. McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Agnes M. Rodriguez Esquire
Represented By: Joshua Revesz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?