City of San Jose, et al v. FCC, et al
Petitioner: CITY OF ARCADIA, Calfornia, CITY OF MONTEREY, California, CITY OF PIEDMONT, California, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, California, CITY OF SAN JOSE, California, CITY OF PORTLAND, Oregon, CITY OF SAN JACINTO, California, CITY OF YUMA, Arizona, CITY OF ISSAQUAH, Washington, CITY OF LAS VEGAS, Nevada, CITY OF ONTARIO, California, CITY OF BURLINGAME, California, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, California, CITY OF BELLEVUE, Washington, CITY OF GIG HARBOR, Washington, TOWN OF FAIRFAX, California, CULVER CITY, California, CITY OF BURIEN, Washington, CITY OF SHAFTER, California and CITY OF KIRKLAND, Washington
Respondent: FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Intervenor: COMPETITIVE CARRIERS ASSOCIATION, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., CTIA - THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION, SPRINT CORPORATION, CITY OF NEW YORK and WIRELESS INFRASTRUCTURE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 19-70144
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 35 Filed (ECF) Respondent FCC in 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147 reply to response (). Date of service: 03/14/2019. [11228616] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Noveck, Scott) [Entered: 03/14/2019 05:25 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 34 Filed (ECF) Petitioners City of Seattle, City of Tacoma, King County and Intervenors City of Tumwater, Colorado Communications and Utility Alliance, County of Thurston and Rainier Communications Commission in 19-70136 response to motion ([ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11220526] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Fellman, Kenneth) [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:52 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 Filed (ECF) Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70123, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of New York, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70124, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70125, 19-70136, Petitioners City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70144, 19-70146 response to motion ([ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to consolidate cases, [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay appellate proceedings). Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11219881] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct filing type. 03/08/2019 by RY] (Van Eaton, Joseph) [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:02 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 32 Filed (ECF) Petitioner City of Huntington Beach in 19-70146 response opposing motion ([ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to consolidate cases, [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to stay appellate proceedings). Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11219662] [19-70146, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70147] (Vigliotta, Michael) [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:47 PM]
March 7, 2019 Filing 31 Filed (ECF) Intervenors City of Bowie, Maryland, City of Eugene, Oregon, City of Huntsville, Alabama, City of Westminister, Maryland and County of Marin in 19-70123, Petitioner City and County of San Francisco in 19-70145 response opposing motion ([ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 28 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 03/07/2019. [11219616] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Lay, Tillman) [Entered: 03/07/2019 12:22 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 30 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: ME) Granting motion to voluntarily dismiss Petition No. 19-70148 pursuant to FRAP 42(b) filed by Petitioners City of North Little Rock and Missouri Association Of Municipal Utilities. This order shall constitute the mandate. [11208088]--[Edited: spread docket text to 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147. 02/28/2019 by RY] (ME) [Entered: 02/26/2019 01:23 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 29 Filed (ECF) Petitioners City of North Little Rock and Missouri Association Of Municipal Utilities in 19-70148 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 02/26/2019. [11207512] [19-70148, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Jarrett, Terry) [Entered: 02/26/2019 09:35 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 28 Filed (ECF) Respondent FCC in 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148 Motion to consolidate cases 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148, 19-70326, 19-70339, 19-70341, 19-70344, Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 02/25/2019. [11206729] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Noveck, Scott) [Entered: 02/25/2019 03:30 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 27 Attorney MacKenzie Fillow substituted by Attorney Elina Druker. [11179892] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (RL) [Entered: 02/05/2019 02:04 PM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 26 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Elina Druker for Intervenor City of New York in 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70146. Substitution for Attorney Ms. MacKenzie Fillow for Intervenor City of New York in 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70146. Date of service: 02/05/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11179050] [19-70147, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70148] (Druker, Elina) [Entered: 02/05/2019 08:36 AM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 25 Added attorney Scott M. Noveck for FCC [11178580] [19-70136, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (JFF) [Entered: 02/04/2019 03:45 PM]
February 4, 2019 Filing 24 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Scott M. Noveck for Respondent FCC. Date of service: 02/04/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11177342] [19-70136]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 19-70144, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148. 02/04/2019 by SLM] (Noveck, Scott) [Entered: 02/04/2019 09:47 AM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 Filed (ECF) Petitioners City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70144, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70123, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of New York, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70124, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70146 Motion for miscellaneous relief [Joint Motion for Case Management Conference including parties City Of Bakersfield, California; City Of Rancho Palos Verdes, California; City Of Coconut Creek, Florida; King County, Washington; City Of Lacey Washington; City Of Olympia, Washington; et al.]. Date of service: 01/25/2019. [11167166] [19-70144, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Van Eaton, Joseph) [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:48 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 22 Filed (ECF) Petitioner Verizon Communications, Inc. in 19-70124, Intervenor Verizon Communications, Inc. in 19-70144 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11165299] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in case 19-70124 only.] (SLM) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:13 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 21 Filed (ECF) Petitioner Puerto Rico Telephone Company, Inc. in 19-70125 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11164252] [19-70125, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148]--[COURT ENTERED FILING. Originally filed in 19-70125 only.] (RY) [Entered: 01/23/2019 05:05 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 Filed (ECF) Petitioners City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70144, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, Intervenors City of Arcadia, City of Bakersfield, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax in 19-70136, 19-70146 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11162467] [19-70144, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Van Eaton, Joseph) [Entered: 01/22/2019 07:42 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Petitioner Sprint Corporation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161203] [19-70123]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 19-70124, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70148, 19-70146, 19-70147. 01/22/2019 by SLM] (Wright, Christopher) [Entered: 01/22/2019 11:50 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Petitioner Montgomery County in 19-70147 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11162021] [19-70147, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70148] (Gotting, Eric) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:38 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 17 Added attorney Eric P. Gotting for Montgomery County, in case 19-70147. [11161984] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (RR) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:31 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 16 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Eric Philip Gotting for Petitioner Montgomery County in 19-70147. Date of service: 01/22/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11161703] [19-70147, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70148] (Gotting, Eric) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:17 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Petitioners City of Seattle, City of Tacoma, King County, League of California Cities, League of Arizona Cities and Towns, League of Oregon Cities and Intervenors City of Bakersfield, City of Coconut Creek, Florida, City of Lacey, City of Olympia, City of Rancho Palos Verdes, City of Tumwater, Colorado Communications and Utility Alliance, Rainier Communications Commission and County of Thurston in 19-70136 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11161691] [19-70136, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Fellman, Kenneth) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:14 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 14 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11161367] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:44 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 13 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/22/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11161357] (AD) [Entered: 01/22/2019 12:44 PM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 Filed (ECF) Petitioners City of North Little Rock and Missouri Association Of Municipal Utilities in 19-70148 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11160803] [19-70148, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Whipple, Peggy) [Entered: 01/22/2019 10:23 AM]
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Petitioner City and County of San Francisco in 19-70145 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/22/2019. [11160636] [19-70145, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Lay, Tillman) [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:35 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/18/2019. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11159142] (AD) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:44 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Petitioner City of Huntington Beach in 19-70146 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/18/2019. [11159094] [19-70146, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Vigliotta, Michael) [Entered: 01/18/2019 12:16 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Added attorney Susannah Larson for Competitive Carriers Association, in case 19-70144. [11158814] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (QDL) [Entered: 01/18/2019 10:50 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Susannah Joy Larson for Intervenor Competitive Carriers Association in 19-70144. Date of service: 01/18/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11158723] [19-70144, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (Larson, Susannah) [Entered: 01/18/2019 10:30 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Added attorney Peggy A. Whipple, Penny Speake for City of North Little Rock Missouri Association Of Municipal Utilities, in case 19-70148. [11155718] [19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147, 19-70148] (RR) [Entered: 01/16/2019 02:15 PM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Peggy A. Whipple for Petitioners City of North Little Rock and Missouri Association Of Municipal Utilities in 19-70148. Date of service: 01/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11155282] [19-70148, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Whipple, Peggy) [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:48 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Penny M. Speake for Petitioners City of North Little Rock and Missouri Association Of Municipal Utilities in 19-70148. Date of service: 01/16/2019. (Party previously proceeding without counsel: No) [11155263] [19-70148, 19-70123, 19-70124, 19-70125, 19-70136, 19-70144, 19-70145, 19-70146, 19-70147] (Speake, Penny) [Entered: 01/16/2019 11:44 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filed Petitioners City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax Corporate Disclosure Statement. Served on 01/10/2019. [11153116] (WL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 08:33 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY UPDATED. FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: Yes. Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/22/2019. Petitioner brief due 04/05/2019 for City of Arcadia, City of Bellevue, City of Burien, City of Burlingame, City of Gig Harbor, City of Issaquah, City of Kirkland, City of Las Vegas, City of Los Angeles, City of Monterey, City of Ontario, City of Piedmont, City of Portland, City of San Jacinto, City of San Jose, City of Shafter, City of Yuma, County of Los Angeles, Culver City and Town of Fairfax. Respondent brief due 05/06/2019 for Federal Communications Commission and United States of America. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. (COURT UPDATE: To reflect the correct petition for review date; resend NDA) [11153114] (WL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 08:28 AM]
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 Received copy of USCA-10th Circuit order filed on 01/10/2019 to transfer appeal to USCA-9th Circuit. [11153112] (WL) [Entered: 01/15/2019 08:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of San Jose, et al v. FCC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF ARCADIA, Calfornia
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF MONTEREY, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF PIEDMONT, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF LOS ANGELES, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF SAN JOSE, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF PORTLAND, Oregon
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF SAN JACINTO, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF YUMA, Arizona
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF ISSAQUAH, Washington
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF LAS VEGAS, Nevada
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF ONTARIO, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF BURLINGAME, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF BELLEVUE, Washington
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF GIG HARBOR, Washington
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TOWN OF FAIRFAX, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CULVER CITY, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF BURIEN, Washington
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF SHAFTER, California
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CITY OF KIRKLAND, Washington
Represented By: Gail A. Karish
Represented By: Joseph Leonard Van Eaton Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: COMPETITIVE CARRIERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Jennifer Phurrough Bagg
Represented By: Susannah Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Henry Weissmann
Represented By: Jonathan Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CTIA - THE WIRELESS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Joshua Scott Turner
Represented By: Sara Baxenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SPRINT CORPORATION
Represented By: Elizabeth Austin Bonner
Represented By: Christopher J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CITY OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Elina Druker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WIRELESS INFRASTRUCTURE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Thomas Scott Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL COMMUNICATIONS COMMISSION
Represented By: Scott M. Noveck
Represented By: Richard Kiser Welch
Represented By: Lori Alexiou
Represented By: Jacob Matthew Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Richard Kiser Welch
Represented By: Adam D. Chandler
Represented By: Lori Alexiou
Represented By: Robert Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?